EP0610889 - Method for making a positive lithographic printing plate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/33] | A "direct-to-press" positive lithographic printing plate and method for making same | ||
[1998/41] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.2000 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 07.06.2000 [2000/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AGFA CORPORATION 100 Challenger Road Ridgefield Park, NJ 07660-2199 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/31] | For all designated states Agfa Corporation 100 Challenger Road Ridgefield Park, NJ 07660-2199 / US | ||
Former [1999/24] | For all designated states AGFA CORPORATION 200 Ballardvale Street Wilmington, MA 01887 / US | ||
Former [1996/33] | For all designated states Bayer Corporation Agfa Division, 200 Ballardvale Street Wilmington, MA 01887-1069 / US | ||
Former [1994/33] | For all designated states MILES INC. Agfa Division 200 Ballardvale Street Wilmington Massachusetts 01887-1011 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bailey, Dwayne W. 4 Bryan Circle Billerica MA 01821 / US | 02 /
Langlais, Kenneth L. 10 Russet Lane Andover MA 01810 / US | [1994/33] | Representative(s) | Strasse, Joachim Strasse & Hofstetter, Balanstrasse 57 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/33] | Strasse, Joachim, Dipl.-Ing. Strasse & Hofstetter, Balanstrasse 55 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/33] | Strasse, Joachim, Dipl.-Ing. Strasse, Vonnemann & Partner Balanstrasse 55 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94101904.4 | 08.02.1994 | [1994/33] | Priority number, date | US19930016055 | 10.02.1993 Original published format: US 16055 | [1994/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0610889 | Date: | 17.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0610889 | Date: | 09.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/20, G03F7/07, B41C1/10 | [1994/33] | CPC: |
G03F7/2055 (EP,US);
B41C1/1075 (EP,US);
G03F7/07 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB [1994/33] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer positiven lithographischen Druckplatte | [1998/41] | English: | Method for making a positive lithographic printing plate | [1998/41] | French: | Méthode de fabrication d'une plaque lithographique positive | [1998/41] |
Former [1994/33] | Direktdruck-Abbildungssystem für positive lithographische Druckplatte und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | ||
Former [1994/33] | A "direct-to-press" positive lithographic printing plate and method for making same | ||
Former [1994/33] | Système d'image à impression directe pour plaque lithographique positive et méthode de fabrication | Examination procedure | 11.10.1994 | Examination requested [1994/49] | 23.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 22.10.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 09.12.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 09.06.1999 | [2000/23] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0503847 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] * column 6, line 21 - line 25 *; | [A]JPH04260041 ; | [DA]EP0423399 (AGFA GEVAERT NV [BE]) [DA] * the whole document *; | [A]DE4031418 (MITSUBISHI PAPER MILLS LTD [JP]) [A] * column 1, line 48 - line 62 *; | [A]WO9221517 (MISOMEX AB [SE]) [A] * page 5, line 33 - page 6, line 7 *; | [PA]EP0572348 (ESKOFOT [DK]) [PA] * the whole document *; | [A]US4038077 (LAND EDWIN H) [A] * figures 4,6 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930129), vol. 17, no. 48, Database accession no. (P - 1477), & JP04260041 A 19920916 (FUJITSU LIMITED) [A] * abstract * |