EP0610931 - Production method of strong and tough thick steel plate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.06.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Steel Corporation 6-3 Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/33] | For all designated states NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION 6-3 Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoshie, Atsuhiko, c/o Nippon Steel Corporation Development Bureau, 20-1, Shintomi Futtsu-shi, Chiba / JP | 02 /
Fujita, Takashi, c/o Nippon Steel Corporation Development Bureau, 20-1, Shintomi Futtsu-shi, Chiba / JP | 03 /
Fujioka, Masaaki, c/o Nippon Steel Corporation Development Bureau, 20-1, Shintomi Futtsu-shi, Chiba / JP | 04 /
Nomiyama, Yuji, c/o Nippon Steel Corporation Oita-Works, 1, Oaza Nishinosu Oita-shi, Oita / JP | 05 /
Miyawaki, Hiroki, c/o Nippon Steel Corporation Technical Development Bureau Plant, 20-1, Shintomi Futtsu-shi, Chiba / JP | [1994/33] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/33] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94102063.8 | 10.02.1994 | [1994/33] | Priority number, date | JP19930022901 | 10.02.1993 Original published format: JP 2290193 | JP19930026879 | 16.02.1993 Original published format: JP 2687993 | JP19930029143 | 18.02.1993 Original published format: JP 2914393 | JP19930223610 | 08.09.1993 Original published format: JP 22361093 | [1994/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0610931 | Date: | 17.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0610931 | Date: | 16.04.1997 | [1997/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C21D8/02 | [1994/33] | CPC: |
C21D8/0242 (EP,US);
B21B1/22 (EP,US);
B21B2015/0071 (EP,US);
C21D2211/005 (EP,US);
C21D8/0226 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/33] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen von dicken, festen und zähen Stahlplatten | [1994/33] | English: | Production method of strong and tough thick steel plate | [1994/33] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de tôles d'acier épaisses, fortes et tenaces | [1994/33] | Examination procedure | 04.03.1994 | Examination requested [1994/33] | 07.06.1999 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1999/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2537188 (BWG BERGWERK WALZWERK) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [AD]GB2001673 (NIPPON KOKAN KK); | [A]JPH04154912 ; | [A]JPH03232923 ; | [AD]JPS59182916 ; | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920916), vol. 016, no. 443, Database accession no. (C - 0985), & JP04154912 A 19920527 (KAWASAKI STEEL CORP) [A] * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920114), vol. 016, no. 013, Database accession no. (C - 0901), & JP03232923 A 19911016 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [A] * abstract * | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850215), vol. 009, no. 036, Database accession no. (C - 266), & JP59182916 A 19841017 (SUMITOMO KINZOKU KOGYO KK) [AD] * abstract * | [A] - KSENOFONTOV A G, "HIGH-TEMPERATURE THERMOPLASTIC STRENGTHENING OF STEELS ST3SP AND 09G2S", METAL SCIENCE AND HEAT TREATMENT, (19910701), vol. 33, no. 7 / 08, pages 503 - 505, XP000329903 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00778648 | [A] - SPASSKII M N ET AL, "MICROSTRUCTURE OF STEEL 20 STRENGTHENED BY HIGH-TEMPERATURE MULTIPLE COMPLETELY REVERSED BENDING", METAL SCIENCE AND HEAT TREATMENT, (19890101), vol. 31, no. 1/02, pages 108 - 114, XP000074664 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00738144 |