EP0612112 - Process of producing a chalcopyrite semiconductor film [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/34] | Chalcopyrite structure semiconductor film and process of producing the same | ||
[1998/20] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.1999 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.05.1999 [1999/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/20] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | ||
Former [1994/34] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Negami, Takayuki 6-6-107, Myoukenzaka Katano City, 576 / JP | 02 /
Nishitani, Mikihiko 2-16-5, Gakuen-Midorigaoka Nara City 631 / JP | 03 /
Kohiki, Shigemi 3-2-1-1009, Taishibashi, Asahi-ku Osaka City 535 / JP | 04 /
Wada, Takahiro 2-26-3, Amanogahara Katano City 576 / JP | [1994/34] | Representative(s) | advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft Tappe mbB Widenmayerstraße 4 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/34] | Dr. Elisabeth Jung Dr. Jürgen Schirdewahn Dipl.-Ing. Claus Gernhardt Postfach 40 14 68 D-80714 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94102089.3 | 10.02.1994 | [1994/34] | Priority number, date | JP19930025287 | 15.02.1993 Original published format: JP 2528793 | [1994/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0612112 | Date: | 24.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0612112 | Date: | 21.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0612112 | Date: | 13.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/032, H01L31/18, H01L33/00 | [1994/34] | CPC: |
H01L31/0322 (EP,US);
Y02E10/541 (EP,US);
Y02P70/50 (EP,US);
Y10S148/153 (EP,US);
Y10S438/93 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/34] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer chalkopyrit-Halbleiterschicht | [1998/20] | English: | Process of producing a chalcopyrite semiconductor film | [1998/20] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un film chalcopyrite semiconducteur | [1998/20] |
Former [1994/34] | Chalkopyrit-Halbleiterfilm und Herstellungsverfahren | ||
Former [1994/34] | Chalcopyrite structure semiconductor film and process of producing the same | ||
Former [1994/34] | Couche de semi-conducteur à structure de chalcopyrite et méthode de fabrication | Miscellaneous | EPB 1998/20: (deleted) | EPB 1998/20: (deleted) | EPB 1998/20: (deleted) | EPB 1997/44: Teilanmeldung 97113690.8 eingereicht am 07/08/97 | EPB 1997/44: Divisional application 97113690.8 filed on 07/08/97 | EPB 1997/44: Demande divisionnaire 97113690.8 déposée le 07/08/97 | Examination procedure | 10.02.1994 | Examination requested [1994/34] | 21.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.08.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP97113690.8 / EP0817279 | Opposition(s) | 16.02.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4004342 (PARK YOON SOO, et al) [X] 1,13,14 * column W *; | [A]JPH04324647 ; | [A]JPH02270381 ; | [A]EP0360403 (ATLANTIC RICHFIELD CO [US]) [A] 12 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930330), vol. 017, no. 165, Database accession no. (E - 1343), & JP04324647 A 19921113 (DOWA MINING CO LTD) [A] 2-8,11,12 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910122), vol. 015, no. 026, Database accession no. (E - 1025), & JP02270381 A 19901105 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-3,11,12 * abstract * |