30.10.2009 |
Change - representative |
published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] |
06.08.2004 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] |
04.01.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] |
10.11.2000 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 27.12.2000 [2000/52] |
27.10.2000 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.12.2000 [2000/50] |
20.04.2000 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.06.2000 [2000/23] |
30.12.1999 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.02.2000 [2000/07] |
26.11.1999 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 12.01.2000 [2000/02] |
04.12.1998 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 20.01.1999 [1999/03] |
17.08.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
21.07.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
21.07.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
07.07.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
16.06.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
30.01.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
29.01.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
31.01.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
23.10.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
19.06.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
19.02.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
24.01.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
20.10.1995 |
First examination report |
|
06.12.1994 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 25.01.1995 [1995/04] |
23.09.1994 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 09.11.1994 [1994/45] |