Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2760947B | Global Dossier | 04.06.1998 | B2 | JPH06319930 | 22.11.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | DE4314563 | 04.05.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9401038 | 13.12.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | DE4314563 | 04.05.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1038393C | 20.05.1998 | C | CN1094989 | 16.11.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | DE4314563 | 04.05.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CZ287578 | 13.12.2000 | B6 | CZ95094 | 16.08.1995 | A3 | Priority number | Date | DE4314563 | 04.05.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE4323136 | 05.10.1995 | C2 | DE4323136 | 12.01.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE4323136 | 10.07.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HU215332 | 28.12.1998 | B | HUT69440 | 28.09.1995 | A | HU9400659D0 | 30.05.1994 | D0 | Priority number | Date | DE4314563 | 04.05.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL57560Y | 31.12.1999 | Y1 | Priority number | Date | DE4314563 | 04.05.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI9400205 | 31.12.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | DE4314563 | 04.05.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5618324 | 08.04.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US62493796 | 27.03.1996 | US23788694 | 04.05.1994 | DE4314563 | 04.05.1993 | US70118996 | 21.08.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA941690 | 05.10.1994 | B | Priority number | Date | DE4314563 | 04.05.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0623377 | Global Dossier | 20.01.1999 | B1 | EP0623377 | 09.11.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE4323136 | 10.07.1993 | DE4314563 | 04.05.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE175889T | 15.02.1999 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE4323136 | 10.07.1993 | DE4314563 | 04.05.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59407671D1 | 04.03.1999 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE4323136 | 10.07.1993 | DE4314563 | 04.05.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2129533T | 16.06.1999 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE4323136 | 10.07.1993 | DE4314563 | 04.05.1993 |