EP0608000 - Antenna apparatus and attitude control method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.07.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.08.1997 [1997/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Steel Corporation 6-3 Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | For all designated states NEMOTO PROJECT INDUSTRY CO., LTD. 1095-15 Yoshihashi Yachiyo-shi Chiba-ken, 276 / JP | For all designated states NIPPON HOSO KYOKAI 2-1, Jinnan 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/30] | For all designated states NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION 6-3 Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | ||
For all designated states NEMOTO PROJECT INDUSTRY CO., LTD. 1095-15 Yoshihashi Yachiyo-shi Chiba-ken, 276 / JP | |||
For all designated states NIPPON HOSO KYOKAI 2-1, Jinnan 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Uematsu, Masahiro, c/o NIPPON STEEL CORP. 6-3, 2-chome, Otemachi Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | 02 /
Harakawa, Tetsumi, c/o NIPPON STEEL CORP. 6-3, 2-chome, Otemachi Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | 03 /
Hiratsuka, Ryuichi, c/o NIPPON STEEL CORP. 6-3, 2-chome, Otemachi Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | 04 /
Ohmaru, Kenji, c/o NIPPON HOSO KYOKAI 2-1, 2-chome, Jinnan Shibuya-ku, Tokyo 150 / JP | 05 /
Yamazaki, Shigeru, c/o NIPPON HOSO KYOKAI 2-1, 2-chome, Jinnan Shibuya-ku, Tokyo 150 / JP | 06 /
Ito, Yasuhiro, c/o NIPPON HOSO KYOKAI 2-1, 2-chome, Jinnan Shibuya-ku, Tokyo 150 / JP | 07 /
Nemoto, Isao, c/o NEMOTO PROJECT IND. CO., LTD. 1095-15 Yoshihashi Yachiyo-shi, Chiba-ken 276 / JP | 08 /
Kato, Kazuro, c/o NEMOTO PROJECT IND. CO., LTD. 1095-15 Yoshihashi Yachiyo-shi, Chiba-ken 276 / JP | [1994/30] | Representative(s) | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/30] | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94102432.5 | 11.04.1989 | [1994/30] | Priority number, date | JP19880090060 | 12.04.1988 Original published format: JP 9006088 | JP19880135265 | 01.06.1988 Original published format: JP 13526588 | JP19880135266 | 01.06.1988 Original published format: JP 13526688 | JP19880154219 | 22.06.1988 Original published format: JP 15421988 | [1994/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0608000 | Date: | 27.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/18, H01Q3/08, G05D3/12 | [1994/30] | CPC: |
H01Q1/185 (EP,US);
H01Q1/12 (KR);
H01Q1/18 (EP,US);
H01Q3/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, LI, SE [1994/30] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anordnung zur Antennenstabilisierung | [1994/30] | English: | Antenna apparatus and attitude control method | [1994/30] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour stabiliser des antennes | [1994/30] | Examination procedure | 27.07.1994 | Examination requested [1994/38] | 15.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/35] | 02.04.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1997/35] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP89106355.4 / EP0338379 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1997 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3986092 (TIJSMA SJOERD, et al) [A] 1-6 * column 1, line 29 - column 2, line 32; column 2, line 59 - column 3, line 62; claims 1, 2; figures 1, 2 *; | [X]EP0107232 (HOLLANDSE SIGNAALAPPARATEN BV [NL]) [X] 1-6 * page 1, line 23 - page 4, line 8; page 5, line 19 - page 6, line 29; figures 1, 2; claims 1 - 7 *; | [A]EP0141859 (FANUC LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2,4,6* whole document *; | [X]US4725843 (SUZUKI KATSUO [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,5 * abstract; column 2, line 23 - column 3, line 32; column 4, lines 49 - 64; column 5, line 67 - column 6, line 30; column 7, lines 12 - 45; column 15, lines 28 - 55; column 16, lines 34 - 53; * * column 17, lines 28 - 64; column 18, line 64 - column 19, line 19; column 23, lines 45 - 67; figures 1 - 5 * |