EP0614198 - Surge arrester [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.01.1998 [1998/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASEA BROWN BOVERI AG Haselstrasse 16 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1997/06] | For all designated states ASEA BROWN BOVERI AG Haselstrasse 16 5401 Baden / CH | ||
Former [1994/36] | For all designated states ABB Management AG Haselstrasse 16 CH-5401 Baden / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Leupp, Peter Pilgerweg 10 CH-8800 Thalwil / CH | 02 /
Moritz, Bertil Trappgatan 2 Västeras / SE | 03 /
Schmidt, Walter Im Rotenstein 17 CH-5454 Bellikon / CH | [1994/36] | Application number, filing date | 94102537.1 | 19.02.1994 | [1994/36] | Priority number, date | DE19934306691 | 04.03.1993 Original published format: DE 4306691 | [1994/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0614198 | Date: | 07.09.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0614198 | Date: | 14.09.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0614198 | Date: | 15.01.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H01C7/12 | [1994/36] | CPC: |
H01C7/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1994/36] | Title | German: | Ueberspannungsableiter | [1994/36] | English: | Surge arrester | [1994/36] | French: | Parafoudre | [1994/36] | Examination procedure | 29.09.1994 | Examination requested [1994/50] | 04.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.07.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS63313805 ; | [X]EP0230103 (RAYCHEM GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4,8,10-12 * page 3, paragraph 2 * * page 4, paragraph 2 - page 10, paragraph 4 * * figures 1-8 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890414), vol. 13, no. 155, Database accession no. (E - 743), & JP63313805 A 19881221 (OTOWA DENKI KOGYO KK) [A] 12 * abstract * | by applicant | EP0335480 |