Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0612536
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
27.10.2000 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 13.12.2000 [2000/50] |
03.03.2000 |
Change - applicant |
published on 19.04.2000 [2000/16] |
12.11.1999 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] |
20.10.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
25.06.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
25.06.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
18.06.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
11.06.1999 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 28.07.1999 [1999/30] |
16.02.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
20.11.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
20.11.1998 |
Change - oral proceedings |
|
20.11.1998 |
Change - German title |
published on 07.01.1999 [1999/01] |
27.08.1998 |
Change - oral proceedings |
|
31.03.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
05.02.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
22.01.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
02.09.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
16.04.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
10.04.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
29.01.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
15.11.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
02.04.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
29.02.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
07.02.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
11.09.1995 |
First examination report |
|
23.02.1995 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 12.04.1995 [1995/15] |
15.07.1994 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 31.08.1994 [1994/35] |