EP0614643 - Shower partition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.1997 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.10.1997 [1997/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koralle Sanitärprodukte GmbH Industriegelände Hollwiesen 32602 Vlotho / DE | [1996/30] |
Former [1994/37] | For all designated states KORALLE-SANITÄRPRODUKTE GmbH & Co. Hollwieser Strasse 45 D-32602 Vlotho / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Franke, Ulrich Hermann Vorm Holzschlingen 35 D-32049 Herford / DE | [1994/37] | Representative(s) | Stracke, Alexander, et al Loesenbeck - Stracke - Specht - Dantz Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/37] | Stracke, Alexander, Dipl.-Ing., et al Jöllenbecker Strasse 164 D-33613 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 94102953.0 | 28.02.1994 | [1994/37] | Priority number, date | DE19930003156U | 04.03.1993 Original published format: DE 9303156 U | [1994/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0614643 | Date: | 14.09.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0614643 | Date: | 09.10.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A47K3/22 | [1994/37] | CPC: |
A47K3/34 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1996/28] |
Former [1994/37] | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE | Title | German: | Duschabtrennung | [1994/37] | English: | Shower partition | [1994/37] | French: | Cloison de douche | [1994/37] | Examination procedure | 19.07.1994 | Examination requested [1994/37] | 12.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.04.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2134167 (GUENTER & CO ONI METALL) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]DE8618978U (PRADER) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0384215 (KORALLE SANITAERPRODUKTE [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0439795 (KORALLE SANITAERPRODUKTE [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE4011849 (HUEPPE GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * |