EP0638460 - Connecting means [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.05.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.1998 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.07.1998 [1998/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIESMANN+BISCHOFF GmbH Clou Strasse 1 D-56751 Polch / DE | [1995/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kessler, Manfred Im Hofacker 17 D-56220 Urmitz/Rhein / DE | [1995/07] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/07] | Reinhard - Skuhra - Weise & Partner Friedrichstrasse 31 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94102983.7 | 28.02.1994 | [1995/07] | Priority number, date | DE19934326840 | 10.08.1993 Original published format: DE 4326840 | [1995/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0638460 | Date: | 15.02.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B60P3/32, E04B1/343 | [1995/07] | CPC: |
B60P3/32 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1995/07] | Title | German: | Ringankersystem | [1995/07] | English: | Connecting means | [1995/07] | French: | Système d'éléments de liaison | [1995/07] | Examination procedure | 26.06.1995 | Examination requested [1995/34] | 11.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.1998 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1998/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2180802 (BRITISH ALCAN ALUMINIUM LIMITED) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [Y]FR2501309 (J. LAMBERET) [Y] 1,3,4,10 * figures 1,2 *; | [Y]EP0109093 (HUTTER & SCHRANTZ BAUTECHNIK GESELLSCHAFT M.B.H.) [Y] 1-3,7-9 * figure 5 *; | [Y]GB2044187 (FRUEHAUF CORPORATION) [Y] 1-3,5,6,10 * the whole document *; | [Y]FR1603258 (KARL KÄSSBOHRER FAHRZEUGWERKE G.M.B.H.) [Y] 1,3,4 * figure 6 *; | [Y]US4031677 (K. W. TANTLINGER) [Y] 1,7,8 * column 2, line 36 - column 2, line 47; figure 1 *; | [Y]DE1714532U (WIELAND-WERKE A.G.) [Y] 1,7,8 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0541485 (ALUSUISSE-LONZA SERVICES AG) [A] 1 * the whole document * |