EP0617976 - Device to produce aerosol jet [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.11.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PARI GmbH Spezialisten für effektive Inhalation Moosstrasse 9 82319 Starnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/45] | For all designated states PARI GmbH Spezialisten für effektive Inhalation Moosstrasse 9 82319 Starnberg / DE | ||
Former [1994/40] | For all designated states PAUL RITZAU PARI-WERK GmbH Moosstrasse 9 D-82319 Starnberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jaser, Stefan Augsburgerstrasse 17 D-86399 Bobingen / DE | 02 /
Knoch, Martin, Dr. Am Vogelbichl 5 D-82335 Berg / DE | [1994/40] | Representative(s) | Zangs, Rainer E., et al Hoffmann - Eitle ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/40] | Zangs, Rainer E., Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Arabellastrasse 4/VIII D-81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94102985.2 | 28.02.1994 | [1994/40] | Priority number, date | DE19934310575 | 31.03.1993 Original published format: DE 4310575 | [1994/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0617976 | Date: | 05.10.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0617976 | Date: | 15.11.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0617976 | Date: | 12.01.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61M11/02, A61M15/00 | [1995/43] | CPC: |
A61M11/02 (EP,US);
A61M15/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1994/40] | A61M11/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1994/40] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung für die Erzeugung von Aerosolpulsen | [1994/40] | English: | Device to produce aerosol jet | [1994/40] | French: | Dispositif pour la production de jets d'aérosol | [1994/40] | Examination procedure | 26.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/13] | 25.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.09.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.07.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 12.01.2000 | FR | 12.01.2000 | GR | 12.01.2000 | IT | 12.01.2000 | NL | 12.01.2000 | SE | 12.01.2000 | AT | 28.02.2000 | BE | 28.02.2000 | CH | 29.02.2000 | LI | 29.02.2000 | DK | 12.04.2000 | [2008/05] |
Former [2004/35] | ES | 12.01.2000 | |
FR | 12.01.2000 | ||
GR | 12.01.2000 | ||
NL | 12.01.2000 | ||
SE | 12.01.2000 | ||
AT | 28.02.2000 | ||
BE | 28.02.2000 | ||
CH | 29.02.2000 | ||
LI | 29.02.2000 | ||
DK | 12.04.2000 | ||
Former [2004/07] | ES | 12.01.2000 | |
GR | 12.01.2000 | ||
NL | 12.01.2000 | ||
SE | 12.01.2000 | ||
AT | 28.02.2000 | ||
BE | 28.02.2000 | ||
CH | 29.02.2000 | ||
LI | 29.02.2000 | ||
DK | 12.04.2000 | ||
FR | 09.06.2000 | ||
Former [2003/45] | ES | 12.01.2000 | |
NL | 12.01.2000 | ||
SE | 12.01.2000 | ||
AT | 28.02.2000 | ||
BE | 28.02.2000 | ||
CH | 29.02.2000 | ||
LI | 29.02.2000 | ||
DK | 12.04.2000 | ||
FR | 09.06.2000 | ||
Former [2003/08] | ES | 12.01.2000 | |
NL | 12.01.2000 | ||
SE | 12.01.2000 | ||
AT | 28.02.2000 | ||
BE | 28.02.2000 | ||
CH | 29.02.2000 | ||
LI | 29.02.2000 | ||
FR | 09.06.2000 | ||
Former [2002/26] | ES | 12.01.2000 | |
SE | 12.01.2000 | ||
AT | 28.02.2000 | ||
BE | 28.02.2000 | ||
CH | 29.02.2000 | ||
LI | 29.02.2000 | ||
FR | 09.06.2000 | ||
Former [2002/23] | SE | 12.01.2000 | |
AT | 28.02.2000 | ||
BE | 28.02.2000 | ||
CH | 29.02.2000 | ||
LI | 29.02.2000 | ||
FR | 09.06.2000 | ||
Former [2002/02] | AT | 28.02.2000 | |
BE | 28.02.2000 | ||
CH | 29.02.2000 | ||
LI | 29.02.2000 | ||
FR | 09.06.2000 | ||
Former [2001/37] | AT | 28.02.2000 | |
BE | 28.02.2000 | ||
FR | 09.06.2000 | ||
Former [2001/11] | BE | 28.02.2000 | |
FR | 09.06.2000 | ||
Former [2001/09] | FR | 09.06.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4094317 (WASNICH RICHARD D) [A] 1-3,5 * column 4, line 11 - line 21 * * column 4, line 65 - column 5, line 38; figure 4 *; | [A]CH625718 (LUWA AG [CH]) [A] 1,2,7,9,11 * page 2, line 42 - line 67; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0178925 (UNIV AUCKLAND [NZ]) [A] 1 * figure 1; claims 1,2,6-8,11,12,14 *; | [A]GB2164569 (ETELA HAMEEN KEUHKOVAMMAYHDIST) [A] 1 * page 2, line 71 - line 97; figures 1,2,5 * | Examination | - BEINERT T. ET AL, PNEUMOLOGIE, SONDERHEFT NR. 2, (1990), vol. 44, page 1026 |