EP0614662 - Use of (2E,4E,6E,10E)-3,7,11,15-tetramethyl-2,4,6,10,14-hexadecapentaenoic acid for the treatment of leukaemia [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.01.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.1998 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.02.1998 [1998/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eisai Co., Ltd. 6-10, Koishikawa 4-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo / JP | [1994/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsurumi, Hisashi 23-21, Noritakenaka 1-chome Gifu-shi, Gifu / JP | 02 /
Takahashi, Takeshi 1-20, Fukuzumicho Gifu-shi, Gifu / JP | 03 /
Moriwaki, Hisataka 11, Kaguracho Gifu-shi, Gifu / JP | 04 /
Muto, Yasutoshi 3459-91, Nagara Gifu-shi, Gifu / JP | 05 /
Asano, Shigetaka 20-25, Ohmiya 1-chome Suginami-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1994/37] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/37] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 D-81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94103055.3 | 01.03.1994 | [1994/37] | Priority number, date | JP19930076388 | 11.03.1993 Original published format: JP 7638893 | JP19930300806 | 08.11.1993 Original published format: JP 30080693 | [1994/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0614662 | Date: | 14.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/20 | [1994/37] | CPC: |
A61K31/20 (EP);
A61K31/202 (KR);
A61K48/00 (KR);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1994/37] | Title | German: | Verwendung von (2E, 4E, 6E, 10E)-3,7,11,15-Tetramethyl-2,4,6,10,14-Hexadecapentaensäure zur Behandlung der Leukämie | [1994/37] | English: | Use of (2E,4E,6E,10E)-3,7,11,15-tetramethyl-2,4,6,10,14-hexadecapentaenoic acid for the treatment of leukaemia | [1994/37] | French: | Utilisation de l'acide (2E, 4E, 6E, 10E)-3,7,11,15-tétraméthyl-2,4,6,10,14-Hexadécapentaenoique pour le traitement de la leucémie | [1994/37] | Examination procedure | 27.10.1994 | Examination requested [1994/51] | 22.12.1997 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1998/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX] - TSURUMI, H. ET AL, "DIFFERENTIATION INDUCTION OF HUMAN PROMYELOCYTIC LEUKEMIA CELLS BY ACYCLIC RETINOID (POLYPRENOIC ACID)", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF HEMATOLOGY, (199312), vol. 59, no. 1, pages 9 - 15 [PX] 1-4 * the whole document * | [X] - SASAKI, K. ET AL, "INDUCTION TO GRANULOCYTIC DIFFERENTIATION OF HUMAN PROMYELOCYTIC LEUKEMIA CELLS (HL-60) BY POLYPRENOIC ACID (E5166)", THE BULLETIN OF THE YAMAGUCHI MEDICAL SCHOOL, (198612), vol. 33, no. 1-4, pages 1 - 7 [X] 1-4 * the whole document * | [DA] - ISHIKURA, H. ET AL, "DIFFERENTIATION OF MOUSE LEUKEMIC M1 CELLS INDUCED BY POLYPRENOIDS", LEUKEMIA RESEARCH, (1984), vol. 8, no. 5, doi:doi:10.1016/0145-2126(84)90105-X, pages 843 - 852, XP026298024 [DA] 1-4 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0145-2126(84)90105-X | [A] - MUTO, Y. ET AL, "IN VITRO BINDING AFFINITY OF NOVEL SYNTHETIC POLYPRENOIDS (POLYPRENOIC ACIDS) TO CELLULAR RETINOID-BINDING PROTEINS", GANN (JAPANESE JOURNAL OF CANCER RESEARCH), (198112), vol. 72, no. 6, pages 974 - 977 [A] 1-4 * the whole document * | [A] - FUKUTOMI, Y. ET AL, "INHIBITORY EFFECTS OF ACYCLIC RETINOID (POLYPRENOIC ACID) AND ITS HYDROXY DERIVATIVE ON CELL GROWTH AND ON SECRETION OF ALPHA-FETOPROTEIN IN HUMAN HEPATOMA-DERIVED CELL LINE (PLC/PRF/5)", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF CANCER RESEARCH, (199012), vol. 81, no. 2, pages 1281 - 1285, XP009137999 [A] 1-4 * the whole document * |