EP0614873 - Hexafluoropropylene oxide compounds and a method of making same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.06.1999 [1999/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/37] | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tarumi, Yasuo 224-17, Kenzaki-machi Takasaki-shi, Gunma-ken / JP | 02 /
Koike, Noriyuki 608-1, Yoshii, Yoshii-machi Tano-gun, Gunma-ken / JP | 03 /
Takago, Toshio 94-7, Yanase Annaka-shi, Gunma-ken / JP | [1994/37] | Representative(s) | Jaeger, Klaus, et al propindus Patentanwälte NIEDMERS JAEGER KÖSTER Auguste-Viktoria-Allee 87 13403 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/37] | Jaeger, Klaus, Dr., et al Jaeger, Böck & Köster, Patentanwälte, Pippinplatz 4a D-82131 Gauting / DE | Application number, filing date | 94103113.0 | 02.03.1994 | [1994/37] | Priority number, date | JP19930066022 | 02.03.1993 Original published format: JP 6602293 | JP19930066020 | 02.03.1993 Original published format: JP 6602093 | [1994/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0614873 | Date: | 14.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0614873 | Date: | 10.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C07C59/60 | [1998/24] | CPC: |
C07C59/60 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1994/37] | C07C59/58 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/37] | Title | German: | Hexafluorpropylenoxide und deren Herstellungsmethode | [1994/37] | English: | Hexafluoropropylene oxide compounds and a method of making same | [1994/37] | French: | Composés contenant le group hexafluoropropylène-oxy et procédé pour leur préparation | [1998/24] |
Former [1994/37] | Oxydes de hexafluoropropylène et procédé pour leur préparation | Examination procedure | 31.01.1995 | Examination requested [1995/13] | 20.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.10.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0411666 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1-10 * page 1, line 1 - page 7, line 19; claims 1-5 *; | [DA]GB2053902 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND) [DA] 1-10 * page 5, line 28 - page 6, line 43 * * claim 18 * |