Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0615120
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
30.10.1998 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 16.12.1998 [1998/51] |
16.07.1998 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
18.03.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
06.03.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
06.03.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
13.11.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
14.10.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
12.06.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
23.05.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
18.03.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
21.02.1997 |
First examination report |
|
19.02.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
16.08.1996 |
Change - representative |
published on 02.10.1996 [1996/40] |
26.07.1996 |
Change - applicant |
published on 11.09.1996 [1996/37] |
16.03.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
10.10.1995 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 29.11.1995 [1995/48] |
24.02.1995 |
Publication of search report |
published on 12.04.1995 [1995/15] |
08.02.1995 |
Change - classification |
published on 29.03.1995 [1995/13] |
29.07.1994 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 14.09.1994 [1994/37] |