EP0615120 - Leak control of a gas or liquid gas container [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.10.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.12.1998 [1998/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dynamit Nobel GmbH Explosivstoff- und Systemtechnik Kaiserstrasse 1 53840 Troisdorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/37] | For all designated states Dynamit Nobel GmbH Explosivstoff- und Systemtechnik Kaiserstrasse 1 53839 Troisdorf / DE | ||
Former [1994/37] | For all designated states DYNAMIT NOBEL AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Kaiserstrasse 1 D-53840 Troisdorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brede, Uwe Boenerstrasse 32 D-90765 Fürth / DE | 02 /
Kraft, Josef Heinrichsburger Strasse 33 D-92348 Berg / DE | [1994/37] | Representative(s) | Schulz, Wilfried, et al Dynamit Nobel AG Abt.Patente und Dokumentation 53839 Troisdorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/40] | Schulz, Wilfried, et al Dynamit Nobel AG Abt.Patente und Dokumentation 53839 Troisdorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 94103310.2 | 04.03.1994 | [1994/37] | Priority number, date | DE19934307378 | 09.03.1993 Original published format: DE 4307378 | [1994/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0615120 | Date: | 14.09.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0615120 | Date: | 12.04.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G01M3/32, G01M3/28, B60R21/26 | [1995/13] | CPC: |
G01M3/329 (EP,US);
F17C13/00 (KR);
G01L19/12 (EP,US);
G01M3/2876 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1994/37] | G01M3/32 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1994/37] | Title | German: | Leckgaskontrolle eines Gas- oder Flüssiggasbehälters | [1994/37] | English: | Leak control of a gas or liquid gas container | [1994/37] | French: | Contrôle de fuite d'un réservoir à gaz ou à gaz liquide | [1994/37] | Examination procedure | 29.09.1995 | Examination requested [1995/48] | 24.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.03.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/51] | 21.07.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1998/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2636428 (BONFIGLIOLI GIUSEPPE [IT]) [X] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0161702 (DOUWE EGBERTS TABAKSFAB [NL]) [A] 1 * page 3 - page 4 *; | [A]EP0311475 (CARNAUD SA [FR]) [A] 1-10 * column 6 - column 7 *; | [A]US5052586 (PHILIPP JUERGEN D [CA], et al) [A] 4 * column 5, line 16 - line 57 *; | [A]US3884500 (WAGNER JOSEPH P) [A] 1,4 * claims 1-7 *; | [A]GB2191635 (VEGLIA BORLETTI SRL) [A] 4,5 * claims 1-5 *; | [A]FR2254021 (UTILISATION RATION GAZ [FR]) [A] 8-10 * page 5 * |