EP0625484 - Aeration device for with water filled tanks, especially clarification tanks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 16.10.1998 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.1998 | Refusal of application | published on 02.12.1998 [1998/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Egner, Siegfried Obere Austrasse 14 D-74740 Adelsheim / DE | [1994/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Egner, Siegfried Am Berg 2 D-74740 Adelsheim / DE | 02 /
Blaha, Stefan Osterburkener Strasse 33 D-74706 Osterburkener / DE | 03 /
Pauli, Gerhard Gottlieb-Gräf-Strasse 8 D-74740 Adelsheim / DE | [1994/47] | Representative(s) | Clemens, Gerhard, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Müller, Clemens & Hach Lerchenstrasse 56 74074 Heilbronn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/47] | Clemens, Gerhard, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Müller, Clemens & Hach Lerchenstrasse 56 D-74074 Heilbronn / DE | Application number, filing date | 94103411.8 | 07.03.1994 | [1994/47] | Priority number, date | DE19934309686 | 25.03.1993 Original published format: DE 4309686 | [1994/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0625484 | Date: | 23.11.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C02F3/20 | [1994/47] | CPC: |
C02F3/201 (EP);
B01F23/23124 (EP);
B01F23/231261 (EP);
Y02W10/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1994/47] | Title | German: | Belüftervorrichtung für mit einem Flüssigkeitsmedium beaufschlagten Becken, insbesondere Klärbecken | [1994/47] | English: | Aeration device for with water filled tanks, especially clarification tanks | [1994/47] | French: | Dispositif d'aération pour cuves remplies de liquide, particulièrement pour clarificateurs | [1994/47] | Examination procedure | 25.04.1995 | Examination requested [1995/26] | 11.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 07.07.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1998/49] | 17.07.1998 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1998/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1998 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE9006868U (VENATOR INC.) [X] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3441731 (SUPRAFILT GES FUER UMWELTTECHN [DE]) [A] 1,9 * page 1; figure -; claim - * |