EP0622085 - Sprouted vegetable seeds sterilizing method, and sprouted vegetables cultivating method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.06.2001 [2001/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daisey Kikai Co., Ltd. 2-1, Oaza Mitsugi Tsurugashima, Saitama-ken / JP | [1999/45] |
Former [1994/44] | For all designated states Daisey Kikai Co., Ltd. Asahi-seimei Bldg. 8F, 3-9, Amanuma 2 chome Suginami-ku, Tokyo 167 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suzuki, Tomosaburo c/o Daisey Kikay Co., Ltd., 336-39, Ooi Tsukui-cho, Tsukui-gun, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Takizawa, Tsuneo c/o Daisey Kikai Co., Ltd., 6-13, Nanyodai 2 chome Hachioji-shi, Tokyo / JP | [1994/44] | Representative(s) | Hering, Hartmut, et al Patentanwälte Berendt, Leyh & Hering Innere Wiener Strasse 20 81667 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/44] | Hering, Hartmut, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Berendt, Leyh & Hering Innere Wiener Strasse 20 D-81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94103440.7 | 07.03.1994 | [1994/44] | Priority number, date | JP19930091790 | 13.03.1993 Original published format: JP 9179093 | [1994/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0622085 | Date: | 02.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0622085 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61L2/04, A61L2/06, A01C1/00 | [1994/44] | CPC: |
A01C1/00 (EP,US);
A61L2/0023 (EP,US);
A61L2/0094 (EP,US);
A61L2/04 (EP,US);
A61L2/06 (EP,US);
A61L2/07 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1994/44] | Title | German: | Sterilisierungsverfahren für gekeimte Gemüsesamen und Verfahren zur Kultivierung von gekeimten Gemüsen | [1994/44] | English: | Sprouted vegetable seeds sterilizing method, and sprouted vegetables cultivating method | [1994/44] | French: | Méthode de stérilisation des graines de végétaux en germination et méthode de culture de végétaux en germination | [1999/28] |
Former [1994/44] | Méthode de stérilisation des graines de végétaux en germination et méthode de cultivation de végétaux en germination | Examination procedure | 21.04.1995 | Examination requested [1995/25] | 02.09.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.01.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.12.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]SU422368 ; | [X]FR1260436 (MUEHLENBAU DRESDEN VEB) [X] 4,5 * the whole document *; | [X]GB1535926 (SMITH W) [X] 1-3,6-9 * examples 3-4 *; | [A]US4261139 (POGUE GARY E) [A] 3,7 * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 8 *; | [A]GB2150803 (NAT RES DEV); | [A]US4551942 (BROWN JAMES E [US]) [A] 10-12; | [X]US4633611 (SCHILLER SIEGFRIED [DD], et al) [X] 1,4,5 * column 1, line 48 - line 55 *; | [A]DE4121344 (BECK HARALD [DE]) [A] 1,4,5* page 1, line 20 - line 27 * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 75, no. 07, Database accession no. 75-B8641W, & SU422368 A 19740826 (VEG MELONS IRRIG RES INS) [X] 1-3,6 * abstract * |