EP0617231 - Oil evaporation burner and method for its operation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2009 | Change - representative | published on 06.01.2010 [2010/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VIESSMANN WERKE GmbH & CO. Viessmannstrasse 35107 Allendorf/Eder / DE | [1998/45] |
Former [1994/39] | For all designated states VIESSMANN WERKE GmbH & CO. Viessmannstrasse D-35107 Allendorf/Eder / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hofbauer, Peter, Prof. Dr.-Ing. Rothenbacher Weg 29 D-51503 Rösrath-Hoffnungsthal / DE | [1994/39] | Representative(s) | Wolf, Günter An der Mainbrücke 16 63456 Hanau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/01] | Wolf, Günter An der Mainbrücke 16 Postfach 700245 63427 Hanau / DE | ||
Former [1994/39] | Wolf, Günter, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Amthor u. Wolf, An der Mainbrücke 16 D-63456 Hanau / DE | Application number, filing date | 94103983.6 | 15.03.1994 | [1994/39] | Priority number, date | DE19934309115 | 23.03.1993 Original published format: DE 4309115 | [1994/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0617231 | Date: | 28.09.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/39] | Type: | A1 / A2 RE Reissue of A-publication | No.: | EP0617231 | Date: | 14.02.1995 | [1995/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0617231 | Date: | 04.11.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.1994 | Classification | IPC: | F23C9/00, F23C7/00, F23D11/40 | [1994/39] | CPC: |
F23C9/006 (EP,US);
F23C7/002 (EP,US);
F23D11/402 (EP,US);
F23C2202/30 (EP,US);
F23C2900/06041 (EP,US);
F23C2900/07002 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1994/39] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Betrieb eines Ölverdampfungsbrenners und Ölverdampfungsbrenner | [1994/39] | English: | Oil evaporation burner and method for its operation | [1994/39] | French: | Brûleur à évaporation de mazout et procédé pour sa mise en oeuvre | [1994/39] | Examination procedure | 28.10.1994 | Examination requested [1994/52] | 10.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.12.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.01.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 13.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.05.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.08.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/43] | Request for further processing for: | 17.01.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 27.01.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.03.1998 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2043869 (UNITED STIRLING AB & CO); | [Y]DE3821526 (MAY MICHAEL G [CH]) [Y] 1 * column 4, line 40 - column 5, line 51; figures 1,2 *; | [DYA]EP0436113 (ASEA BROWN BOVERI [CH]) [DY] 1 * page 7, line 40 - page 7, line 57 * * figures 3,4 * [A] 3; | [PX]WO9319325 (DEUTSCHE FORSCH LUFT RAUMFAHRT [DE]) [PX] 1,2 * page 8, paragraph 2 - page 10, paragraph 2 * * page 10, paragraph 5 - page 11, paragraph 3 * * page 28, paragraph 2 - page 29, paragraph 2 * * page 30, paragraph 3 - page 31, paragraph 3 * * figures 5,6 * |