EP0618320 - Loop-type textile fastener fabric, method of producing same and process of treating same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 18.07.2007 [2007/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUILFORD MILLS, INC. Post Office Box 26969 Greensboro North Carolina 27419-6969 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/40] | For all designated states GUILFORD MILLS, INC. Post Office Box 26969 Greensboro, North Carolina 27419-6969 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Peake, William L., III 5612 Boxborough Greensboro, North Carolina 27407 / US | 02 /
Spillane, Robert T. 4605 Kenbridge Drive Greensboro, North Carolina 27410 / US | 03 /
McCartney, Phillip D. 5009 Millstaff Drive Oak Ridge, North Carolina 27310 / US | 04 /
Huebner, Paul R. 3016 Ardock Drive Greensboro, North Carolina 27410 / US | [1994/40] | Representative(s) | Wilhelm & Dauster Hospitalstrasse 8 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/40] | Wilhelm & Dauster Patentanwälte European Patent Attorneys Hospitalstrasse 8 D-70174 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 94104033.9 | 16.03.1994 | [1994/40] | Priority number, date | US19930034088 | 22.03.1993 Original published format: US 34088 | US19930138335 | 18.10.1993 Original published format: US 138335 | [1994/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0618320 | Date: | 05.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0618320 | Date: | 10.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0618320 | Date: | 19.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | D04B21/02, A44B18/00, D06N7/00 | [1995/19] | CPC: |
D04B21/04 (EP,US);
A44B18/0034 (EP,US);
D10B2403/0112 (EP);
D10B2501/0632 (EP,US);
D10B2503/041 (EP);
Y10T24/2733 (EP,US);
Y10T428/23929 (EP,US);
Y10T428/23957 (EP,US);
Y10T428/23979 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1994/40] | D04B21/02, A44B18/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1994/40] | Title | German: | Textiler Verschlussstoff des Schlingentyps, Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung und Verfahren zu dessen Behandlung | [1994/40] | English: | Loop-type textile fastener fabric, method of producing same and process of treating same | [1994/40] | French: | Etoffe textile de fermeture du type boucle, procédé de sa fabrication et procédé pour son traitement | [1994/40] | Examination procedure | 08.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/02] | 18.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.02.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP97118572.3 / EP0829563 | Opposition(s) | 20.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.08.1998 | CH | 19.08.1998 | GR | 19.08.1998 | LI | 19.08.1998 | NL | 19.08.1998 | DK | 19.11.1998 | PT | 19.11.1998 | IE | 16.03.1999 | LU | 16.03.1999 | [2007/29] |
Former [2003/45] | AT | 19.08.1998 | |
CH | 19.08.1998 | ||
GR | 19.08.1998 | ||
LI | 19.08.1998 | ||
NL | 19.08.1998 | ||
DK | 19.11.1998 | ||
PT | 19.11.1998 | ||
IE | 16.03.1999 | ||
Former [2003/17] | AT | 19.08.1998 | |
CH | 19.08.1998 | ||
GR | 19.08.1998 | ||
LI | 19.08.1998 | ||
NL | 19.08.1998 | ||
PT | 19.11.1998 | ||
IE | 16.03.1999 | ||
MC | 31.03.1999 | ||
Former [2003/08] | AT | 19.08.1998 | |
CH | 19.08.1998 | ||
GR | 19.08.1998 | ||
LI | 19.08.1998 | ||
NL | 19.08.1998 | ||
PT | 19.11.1998 | ||
IE | 16.03.1999 | ||
Former [2001/23] | AT | 19.08.1998 | |
CH | 19.08.1998 | ||
GR | 19.08.1998 | ||
LI | 19.08.1998 | ||
PT | 19.11.1998 | ||
IE | 16.03.1999 | ||
Former [2000/27] | AT | 19.08.1998 | |
CH | 19.08.1998 | ||
LI | 19.08.1998 | ||
PT | 19.11.1998 | ||
IE | 16.03.1999 | ||
Former [2000/17] | AT | 19.08.1998 | |
CH | 19.08.1998 | ||
LI | 19.08.1998 | ||
PT | 19.11.1998 | ||
Former [1999/29] | AT | 19.08.1998 | |
PT | 19.11.1998 | ||
Former [1999/22] | AT | 19.08.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS60126377 ; | [A]US3694815 (BURGER WILLIAM H); | [A]FR2332130 (REICHHOLD CHEMICALS INC [US]); | [A]US4624116 (ROGERS JACK S [US]); | [A]EP0284020 (YOSHIDA KOGYO KK [JP]) [A] 1-4,11,15,20 * column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 8; figure 2C *; | [DA]US4822658 (PACIONE JOSEPH R [CA]); | [A]FR2632830 (APLIX SA [FR]); | [A]EP0517275 (GUILFORD MILLS INC [US]) [A] 1-7,15,16 * figures 1,2; claim 10 * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 85, no. 33, Database accession no. 85-200419, & JPS60126377 A 19850705 (NIPPON KAYAKU K.K.) [A] 23 * abstract * |