EP0621443 - End cap for elongated lighting fixture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.05.1998 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Korte, Heinrich Am Rennschloot D-26810 Ihrhove / DE | [1994/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1994/43] | Representative(s) | Thiel, Christian, et al Patentanwälte Herrmann-Trentepohl Grosse - Bockhorni & Partner Schaeferstrasse 18 44623 Herne / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/43] | Thiel, Christian, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte Herrmann-Trentepohl,Kirschner, Grosse, Bockhorni, Schaeferstrasse 18 D-44623 Herne / DE | Application number, filing date | 94104136.0 | 17.03.1994 | [1994/43] | Priority number, date | DE19934313080 | 21.04.1993 Original published format: DE 4313080 | [1994/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0621443 | Date: | 26.10.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0621443 | Date: | 16.07.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.1994 | Classification | IPC: | F21V19/00 | [1994/43] | CPC: |
F21V19/008 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1994/43] | Title | German: | Kopfstück für eine Langfeldleuchte | [1994/43] | English: | End cap for elongated lighting fixture | [1994/43] | French: | Pièce de tête pour armature lumineuse de forme allongée | [1994/43] | Examination procedure | 10.01.1995 | Examination requested [1995/10] | 08.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.01.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 16.07.1997 | FR | 16.07.1997 | GB | 16.07.1997 | IT | 16.07.1997 | NL | 16.07.1997 | SE | 16.10.1997 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/08] | ES | 16.07.1997 | |
GB | 16.07.1997 | ||
IT | 16.07.1997 | ||
NL | 16.07.1997 | ||
SE | 16.10.1997 | ||
FR | 12.12.1997 | ||
Former [2002/26] | ES | 16.07.1997 | |
GB | 16.07.1997 | ||
IT | 16.07.1997 | ||
SE | 16.10.1997 | ||
FR | 12.12.1997 | ||
Former [1999/42] | GB | 16.07.1997 | |
IT | 16.07.1997 | ||
SE | 16.10.1997 | ||
FR | 12.12.1997 | ||
Former [1998/19] | GB | 16.07.1997 | |
SE | 16.10.1997 | ||
FR | 12.12.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | GB | 16.07.1997 | |
SE | 16.10.1997 | ||
Former [1998/12] | SE | 16.10.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2129536 (CORAZZA FRANCO & C L & S) [A] 1-7,15 * page 1, line 93 - line 109 * * page 1, line 112 - page 2, line 7 * * page 2, line 30 - line 53; figures 3,4-6 *; | [A]GB1072424 (PHILIPS ELECTRONIC ASSOCIATED) [A] 1,3-9,15 * page 1, line 60 - line 83 * * figures 1,2 *; | [AP]EP0555688 (MEYER A & H LEUCHTEN BUEROELEK [DE]) [AP] 1,5-9,13-15 * column 4, line 8 - line 12 * * column 5, line 2 - line 11 * * figures 1-3 * |