EP0618251 - Clear low viscosity high-functional polyethers based on saccharose [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 14.05.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.05.2004 | Revocation of patent | published on 30.06.2004 [2004/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [1999/09] |
Former [1994/40] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gupta, Pramod, Dr. Langemarckstrasse 27 D-50181 Bedburg / DE | 02 /
Sandhagen, Hans-Joachim, Dr. Claudiusstrasse 32 D-41540 Dormagen / DE | 03 /
Betz, Werner, Dr. Waldblick 2 D-51519 Odenthal / DE | 04 /
Leyrer, Ulrich, Dr. Johannes-Dott-Strasse 11 D-51375 Leverkusen / DE | 05 /
Hoppe, Martin, Dr. Walter-Flex-Strasse 30 D-51373 Leverkusen / DE | [1994/40] | Application number, filing date | 94104294.7 | 18.03.1994 | [1994/40] | Priority number, date | DE19934310504 | 31.03.1993 Original published format: DE 4310504 | [1994/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0618251 | Date: | 05.10.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0618251 | Date: | 24.05.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0618251 | Date: | 03.03.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C08G65/28 | [1994/40] | CPC: |
C08G65/34 (EP,KR,US);
C08B37/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08K3/22 (KR);
C08L71/02 (EP,KR,US);
C08G2650/58 (KR);
C08L2666/26 (KR)
| C-Set: |
C08L71/02, C08L2666/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, PT [1994/40] | Title | German: | Niedrigviskose, hochfunktionelle, helle Polyether und Saccharose-Basis | [1994/40] | English: | Clear low viscosity high-functional polyethers based on saccharose | [1994/40] | French: | Polyéthers clairs multifonctionnels à basse viscosité basés sur le saccharose | [1994/40] | Examination procedure | 24.10.1995 | Examination requested [1995/51] | 18.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.08.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
30.11.1999
Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 16 2596 HR The Hague / NL Opponent's representative Gaasbeek, Jeroen (NL) Shell International B.V. Intellectual Property Division P.O. Box 384 NL-2501 CJ The Hague / NL | 02
02.12.1999
ADMISSIBLE THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Abbott Road Dow Center Midland, Michigan 48640 / US Opponent's representative Raynor, John Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/04] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
30.11.1999
Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 NL-2596 HR The Hague / NL Opponent's representative Gaasbeek, Jeroen (NL) Shell International B.V. Intellectual Property Division P.O. Box 384 NL-2501 CJ The Hague / NL | ||
02
02.12.1999
ADMISSIBLE THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Abbott Road Dow Center Midland, Michigan 48640 / US Opponent's representative Raynor, John W.H. Beck, Greener & Co 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn London WC2A 3SZ / GB | 22.02.2000 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 16.06.2000 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 20.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 06.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 09.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 18.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 28.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 07.02.2004 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2004/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1467954 (ICI LTD) [X] 1,2,4,6-8; | [DX]DE2241242 (BAYER AG) [DX] 1-8 |