EP0617200 - Piston pump for feeding gas oil to diesel engines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.08.1998 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states O.M.B. S.r.L. Strada Statale 510 25045 Castegnato Brescia / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1997/40] | For all designated states O.M.B. S.r.L. Strada Statale 510 25045 Castegnato, Brescia / IT | ||
Former [1994/39] | For all designated states O.M.B. S.r.L. Strada Statale 510 I-25045 Castegnato, Brescia / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bugatti, Lucio Strada Statale 510 I-25045 Castegnato, Brescia / IT | [1994/39] | Representative(s) | Lecce, Giovanni Lecce & Calciati S.r.l. Internazionale Brevetti Via Monte Rosa, 14 20149 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1994/39] | Lecce, Giovanni Dott. Giovanni Lecce & C. S.r.l. Via G. Negri 10 I-20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 94104394.5 | 21.03.1994 | [1994/39] | Priority number, date | IT1993MI00569 | 24.03.1993 Original published format: IT MI930569 | [1994/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0617200 | Date: | 28.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0617200 | Date: | 01.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | F02M37/06 | [1994/39] | CPC: |
F04B53/127 (EP);
F02M37/043 (EP);
F04B53/147 (EP);
F02B3/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1994/39] | Title | German: | Kolbenpumpe zur Zuführung von Gasöl zu Dieselmotoren | [1994/39] | English: | Piston pump for feeding gas oil to diesel engines | [1994/39] | French: | Pompe à piston pour l'alimentation en gas-oil d'un moteur diesel | [1994/39] | Examination procedure | 01.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/19] | 17.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.04.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.10.1997 | BE | 01.10.1997 | CH | 01.10.1997 | DK | 01.10.1997 | ES | 01.10.1997 | FR | 01.10.1997 | GR | 01.10.1997 | LI | 01.10.1997 | NL | 01.10.1997 | SE | 01.01.1998 | PT | 02.01.1998 | DE | 03.01.1998 | GB | 21.03.1998 | IE | 21.03.1998 | LU | 21.03.1998 | MC | 15.04.1998 | [2006/14] |
Former [2004/38] | AT | 01.10.1997 | |
BE | 01.10.1997 | ||
CH | 01.10.1997 | ||
DK | 01.10.1997 | ||
ES | 01.10.1997 | ||
GR | 01.10.1997 | ||
LI | 01.10.1997 | ||
NL | 01.10.1997 | ||
SE | 01.01.1998 | ||
PT | 02.01.1998 | ||
DE | 03.01.1998 | ||
FR | 27.02.1998 | ||
GB | 21.03.1998 | ||
IE | 21.03.1998 | ||
LU | 21.03.1998 | ||
MC | 15.04.1998 | ||
Former [2003/08] | AT | 01.10.1997 | |
BE | 01.10.1997 | ||
CH | 01.10.1997 | ||
DK | 01.10.1997 | ||
ES | 01.10.1997 | ||
GR | 01.10.1997 | ||
LI | 01.10.1997 | ||
NL | 01.10.1997 | ||
SE | 01.01.1998 | ||
PT | 02.01.1998 | ||
DE | 03.01.1998 | ||
FR | 27.02.1998 | ||
GB | 21.03.1998 | ||
IE | 21.03.1998 | ||
LU | 31.03.1998 | ||
MC | 15.04.1998 | ||
Former [2003/05] | AT | 01.10.1997 | |
BE | 01.10.1997 | ||
CH | 01.10.1997 | ||
DK | 01.10.1997 | ||
ES | 01.10.1997 | ||
GR | 01.10.1997 | ||
LI | 01.10.1997 | ||
SE | 01.01.1998 | ||
PT | 02.01.1998 | ||
DE | 03.01.1998 | ||
FR | 27.02.1998 | ||
GB | 21.03.1998 | ||
IE | 21.03.1998 | ||
LU | 31.03.1998 | ||
MC | 15.04.1998 | ||
Former [2002/42] | AT | 01.10.1997 | |
BE | 01.10.1997 | ||
CH | 01.10.1997 | ||
DK | 01.10.1997 | ||
ES | 01.10.1997 | ||
GR | 01.10.1997 | ||
IE | 01.10.1997 | ||
LI | 01.10.1997 | ||
SE | 01.01.1998 | ||
PT | 02.01.1998 | ||
DE | 03.01.1998 | ||
FR | 27.02.1998 | ||
GB | 21.03.1998 | ||
LU | 31.03.1998 | ||
MC | 15.04.1998 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 01.10.1997 | |
BE | 01.10.1997 | ||
CH | 01.10.1997 | ||
DK | 01.10.1997 | ||
ES | 01.10.1997 | ||
GR | 01.10.1997 | ||
IE | 01.10.1997 | ||
LI | 01.10.1997 | ||
SE | 01.01.1998 | ||
PT | 02.01.1998 | ||
DE | 03.01.1998 | ||
FR | 27.02.1998 | ||
GB | 21.03.1998 | ||
LU | 31.03.1998 | ||
Former [2002/10] | AT | 01.10.1997 | |
BE | 01.10.1997 | ||
CH | 01.10.1997 | ||
DK | 01.10.1997 | ||
GR | 01.10.1997 | ||
IE | 01.10.1997 | ||
LI | 01.10.1997 | ||
SE | 01.01.1998 | ||
PT | 02.01.1998 | ||
DE | 03.01.1998 | ||
FR | 27.02.1998 | ||
GB | 21.03.1998 | ||
LU | 31.03.1998 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 01.10.1997 | |
BE | 01.10.1997 | ||
CH | 01.10.1997 | ||
DK | 01.10.1997 | ||
GR | 01.10.1997 | ||
LI | 01.10.1997 | ||
SE | 01.01.1998 | ||
PT | 02.01.1998 | ||
DE | 03.01.1998 | ||
FR | 27.02.1998 | ||
GB | 21.03.1998 | ||
LU | 31.03.1998 | ||
Former [1999/25] | AT | 01.10.1997 | |
BE | 01.10.1997 | ||
CH | 01.10.1997 | ||
DK | 01.10.1997 | ||
LI | 01.10.1997 | ||
SE | 01.01.1998 | ||
PT | 02.01.1998 | ||
DE | 03.01.1998 | ||
FR | 27.02.1998 | ||
GB | 21.03.1998 | ||
Former [1998/46] | AT | 01.10.1997 | |
BE | 01.10.1997 | ||
CH | 01.10.1997 | ||
DK | 01.10.1997 | ||
LI | 01.10.1997 | ||
SE | 01.01.1998 | ||
PT | 02.01.1998 | ||
DE | 03.01.1998 | ||
FR | 27.02.1998 | ||
Former [1998/37] | AT | 01.10.1997 | |
CH | 01.10.1997 | ||
DK | 01.10.1997 | ||
LI | 01.10.1997 | ||
SE | 01.01.1998 | ||
PT | 02.01.1998 | ||
DE | 03.01.1998 | ||
FR | 27.02.1998 | ||
Former [1998/35] | AT | 01.10.1997 | |
CH | 01.10.1997 | ||
DK | 01.10.1997 | ||
LI | 01.10.1997 | ||
SE | 01.01.1998 | ||
DE | 03.01.1998 | ||
FR | 27.02.1998 | ||
Former [1998/30] | AT | 01.10.1997 | |
CH | 01.10.1997 | ||
DK | 01.10.1997 | ||
LI | 01.10.1997 | ||
SE | 01.01.1998 | ||
DE | 03.01.1998 | ||
Former [1998/21] | CH | 01.10.1997 | |
LI | 01.10.1997 | ||
SE | 01.01.1998 | ||
Former [1998/15] | CH | 01.10.1997 | |
LI | 01.10.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2185145 (EDWARDS HERBERT C) [X] 1,5,6 * page 1, column R, line 4 - page 2, column R, line 22; figures 1,4-6 * [Y] 7; | [Y]US2290829 (EDWARDS HERBERT C) [Y] 7* page 3, column L, line 29 - line 33; figure - *; | [X]EP0027717 (CATERPILLAR TRACTOR CO [US]) [X] 1-3 * page 6, line 18 - page 8, line 16; figure 2 * |