EP0630711 - Immersion nozzle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.11.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.01.1998 [1998/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DIDIER-WERKE AG Lessingstrasse 16-18 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/52] | For all designated states DIDIER-WERKE AG Lessingstrasse 16-18 D-65189 Wiesbaden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brückner, Raimund Gartenfeldstrasse 21a D-65527 Niedernhausen / DE | 02 /
Gimpera, José Abeggstrasse 19 D-65193 Wiesbaden / DE | [1994/52] | Representative(s) | Brückner, Raimund Didier-Werke AG Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 1 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/52] | Brückner, Raimund, Dipl.-Ing. c/o Didier-Werke AG Lessingstrasse 16-18 D-65189 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 94104559.3 | 23.03.1994 | [1994/52] | Priority number, date | DE19934319966 | 17.06.1993 Original published format: DE 4319966 | [1994/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0630711 | Date: | 28.12.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0630711 | Date: | 22.01.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B22D41/50, B22D41/14 | [1994/52] | CPC: |
B22D41/50 (EP,US);
B22D41/52 (KR);
B22D41/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB [1994/52] | Title | German: | Eintauchausguss | [1994/52] | English: | Immersion nozzle | [1994/52] | French: | Busette de coulée immergée | [1994/52] | Examination procedure | 08.04.1994 | Examination requested [1994/52] | 16.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.07.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.08.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 13.08.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2105881 (MANNESMANN AG) [A] 1 * page 1, line 19 - page 2, line 18; figure .; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0155575 (CONCAST STANDARD AG [CH]) [A] 8 * abstract *; | [A]DE3842789 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND [JP]) [A] 1 * figure 8 *; | [DA]DE4142447 (MANNESMANN AG [DE]) [DA] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE3809071 (DIDIER WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 3-5 * figures 1-5 * |