EP0619212 - Anti-roll device for railway vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.1998 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.05.1998 [1998/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Waggonfabrik Talbot GmbH & Co.KG Jülicher Strasse 213-237 52070 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/09] | For all designated states Waggonfabrik Talbot GmbH & Co.KG Jülicher Strasse 213-237 D-52070 Aachen / DE | ||
Former [1994/41] | For all designated states Waggonfabrik Talbot Jülicher Strasse 213-237 D-52070 Aachen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Düsing, Manfred, Dipl.-Ing. Augustastrasse 21 D-52070 Aachen / DE | 02 /
Lü, Yuan, Dr.-Ing. Roermonderstrasse 13 D-52072 Aachen / DE | 03 /
Jakob, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing. Karl-Friedrich-Strasse 28a D-52072 Aachen / DE | [1994/41] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1995/05] |
Former [1994/41] | Dederichs, August c/o Waggonfabrik Talbot, Jülicher Strasse 213-237 D-52070 Aachen / DE | Application number, filing date | 94104993.4 | 30.03.1994 | [1994/41] | Priority number, date | DE19934311521 | 07.04.1993 Original published format: DE 4311521 | [1994/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0619212 | Date: | 12.10.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0619212 | Date: | 14.05.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B61F5/24, B61F5/22 | [1994/41] | CPC: |
B61F5/22 (EP);
B61F5/148 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1994/41] | Title | German: | Wankstütze für Schienenfahrzeuge | [1994/41] | English: | Anti-roll device for railway vehicles | [1994/41] | French: | Dispositif antiroulis pour véhicules ferroviaires | [1994/41] | Examination procedure | 20.10.1994 | Examination requested [1994/51] | 28.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.11.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1535473 (DBA SA, et al); | [A]FR2232478 (BREDA COST FERROVIARIE [IT]); | [A]FR2434739 (SCHWEIZERISCHE LOKOMOTIV [CH]); | [A]FR2459168 (BUDD CO [US]); | [A]WO8200120 (BUDD CO [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * |