Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0619434 | Global Dossier | 01.03.1995 | A3 | EP0619434 | 12.10.1994 | A2 | Priority number | Date | ITMI930672 | 05.04.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2120377 | 06.10.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI930672 | 05.04.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IT1264004 | 06.09.1996 | B | ITMI930672 | 05.10.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI930672 | 05.04.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5402816 | 04.04.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | ITMI930672 | 05.04.1993 |