EP0619434 - Pressure equaliser device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.02.1998 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.03.1998 [1998/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNIVER S.p.A. Via Eraclito No. 31 I-20128 Milano / IT | [1994/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Migliori, Luciano Via F.lli Cervi, Residenza del Sagitario T 29/1 Milano 2 (Milano) / IT | [1994/41] | Representative(s) | Coloberti, Luigi Luppi Intellectual Property Srl Via De Amicis, 25 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1994/41] | Coloberti, Luigi Via E. de Amicis No. 25 I-20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 94105027.0 | 30.03.1994 | [1994/41] | Priority number, date | IT1993MI00672 | 05.04.1993 Original published format: IT MI930672 | [1994/41] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0619434 | Date: | 12.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0619434 | Date: | 01.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F15B11/08, F15B11/16 | [1995/09] | CPC: |
F15B11/028 (EP,US);
B60G2500/2044 (EP,US);
B60G2500/2046 (EP,US);
F15B2211/20538 (EP,US);
F15B2211/30505 (EP,US);
F15B2211/50518 (EP,US);
F15B2211/57 (EP,US);
F15B2211/7052 (EP,US);
F15B2211/76 (EP,US);
Y10T137/2577 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1994/41] | F15B3/00, F15B5/00, F15B20/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1994/41] | Title | German: | Druckausgleichvorrichtung | [1994/41] | English: | Pressure equaliser device | [1994/41] | French: | Equilibreur de pression | [1994/41] | Examination procedure | 31.07.1995 | Examination requested [1995/39] | 01.10.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/13] | 28.10.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1998/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1997 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3407827 (HYDROMATIK GMBH)[A] 1-3 |