Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0675039 | Global Dossier | 14.10.1998 | B1 | EP0675039 | 04.10.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE4232654 | 29.09.1992 | EP94105084 | 30.03.1994 | US42220195 | 29.03.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE4232654 | 06.07.1995 | C2 | DE4232654 | 31.03.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE4232654 | 29.09.1992 | EP94105084 | 30.03.1994 | US42220195 | 29.03.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5549491 | 27.08.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | DE4232654 | 29.09.1992 | EP94105084 | 30.03.1994 | US42220195 | 29.03.1995 |