EP0622207 - Common ink jet cartridge platform for different print heads [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2000 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304-1112 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto CA 94304-1112 / US | ||
Former [1994/44] | For all designated states HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, California 94304-1181 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Swanson, David W. 2750 Felicita Road Escondido, California 92029 / US | 02 /
Kaplinsky, George T. 9050 Rotherham Avenue San Diego, California 92129 / US | 03 /
Carlin, Timothy J. 10894 Aviary Court San Diego, California 92131 / US | [1994/44] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/44] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94105405.8 | 07.04.1994 | [1994/44] | Priority number, date | US19930055623 | 30.04.1993 Original published format: US 55623 | [1994/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0622207 | Date: | 02.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0622207 | Date: | 19.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0622207 | Date: | 02.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/175, B41J2/21 | [1995/16] | CPC: |
B41J2/17553 (EP,US);
B41J2/17513 (EP,US);
B41J2/17526 (EP,US);
B41J2/1755 (EP,US);
B41J2/17559 (EP,US);
B41J2/2103 (EP,US);
B41J2/2135 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1994/44] | B41J2/175 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/44] | Title | German: | Gemeinsame Farbkassettenplattform für verschiedene Druckköpfe | [1994/44] | English: | Common ink jet cartridge platform for different print heads | [1994/44] | French: | Plate-forme commune pour cartouche à jet d'encre pour têtes d'impression différentes | [1994/44] | Examination procedure | 09.10.1995 | Examination requested [1995/49] | 25.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.01.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.11.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0379151 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-3,8-14,17,18 * column 13, line 16 - line 25; figure 9B * * column 16, line 46 - column 18, line 46; figures 15-17D *; | [A]EP0313205 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1-3,5-7,9-14,16-20 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0478244 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-3,9-14,17,18 * column 7, line 55 - column 8, line 43; figures 4,5 *; | [A]EP0308272 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 5,7,9,16,20 * page 4, line 33 - line 37; figure 1 *; | [A]JPH04247942 ; | [A]EP0418817 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,5,7-9,16,20 * figures 1,10 *; | [A]EP0529879 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1-3,5-7,9-14,16-20 * column 2, line 35 - line 44; figure 1 *; | [A]JPS60242073 ; | [A]US4736213 (PIATT MICHAEL J [US], et al); | [A]JPH02188246 | [A] - "Dual resolution ink jet drum printer", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN., NEW YORK US, (198012), vol. 23, no. 7A, pages 2700 - 2702 [A] 1,3,4,8,10-12,15 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930114), vol. 17, no. 21, Database accession no. (M - 1353), & JP04247942 A 19920903 (CANON) [A] 1-3,9-14,17,18 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860426), vol. 10, no. 114, Database accession no. (M - 473), & JP60242073 A 19851202 (TOSHIBA) [A] 5,7,9,16,20 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19901012), vol. 14, no. 469, Database accession no. (M - 1034), & JP02188246 A 19900724 (CANON) [A] * abstract * |