EP0622425 - Glossy magnetisable pigments [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.05.1997 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.06.1997 [1997/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/44] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmid, Raimund, Dr. Im Falkenhorst 1 D-67435 Neustadt / DE | 02 /
Mronga, Norbert, Dr. Ringstrasse 2 D-69221 Dossenheim / DE | 03 /
Ochmann, Harald, Dr. Wielandstrasse 17 D-67125 Dannstadt-Schauernheim / DE | [1994/44] | Application number, filing date | 94105443.9 | 08.04.1994 | [1994/44] | Priority number, date | DE19934313541 | 24.04.1993 Original published format: DE 4313541 | [1994/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0622425 | Date: | 02.11.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0622425 | Date: | 26.06.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C09C1/00, C09D7/12, C09D11/00, C08K9/02, C03C4/02, C04B33/14 | [1994/44] | CPC: |
C09C1/0015 (EP);
C09C1/0081 (EP);
C01P2006/42 (EP);
C01P2006/62 (EP);
C01P2006/63 (EP);
C01P2006/64 (EP);
C01P2006/65 (EP);
C01P2006/66 (EP);
C09C2200/102 (EP);
C09C2200/1054 (EP);
C09C2200/301 (EP);
C09C2200/304 (EP);
C09C2200/306 (EP);
C09C2200/307 (EP);
C09C2200/401 (EP);
C09C2220/20 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1994/44] | Title | German: | Magnetisierbare Glanzpigmente | [1994/44] | English: | Glossy magnetisable pigments | [1994/44] | French: | Pigments brillants magnétisables | [1994/44] | Examination procedure | 02.08.1994 | Examination requested [1994/44] | 02.11.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.12.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0033457 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 4 * claims 1,6 *; | [A]US3053683 (SEYMOUR YOLLES) [A] 4 * example 8 *; | [A]EP0104075 (ALUMINUM CO OF AMERICA [US]) [A] 1,4 * claims 1,6-8 *; | [PA]EP0571836 (BASF AG [DE]) [PA] 1,2,4-6 * claims 1-5,7 *; | [D]DE4217511 (BASF AG [DE]); | JPH0215176 [ ] (NIPPON CHEMICAL IND); | [DA]US3536520 (MARSHALL WILLIAM J, et al) [DA] 1 * claim 9 *; | [DA]JPS57161055 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19910211), vol. 114, no. 6, Database accession no. 45985p, page 174 [A] 1 * abstract * | [DA] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 82, no. 45, Database accession no. 82-96576E, & JPS57161055 A 19821004 (TOPPAN PRINTING K.K.) [DA] 1 * abstract * |