EP0647569 - Piston for cartridges [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 09.08.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schneider, Falk Walter Fichtenstrasse 7 51580 Reichshof-Wiehl / DE | [1998/24] |
Former [1995/15] | For all designated states Schneider, Falk Walter Fichtenstrasse 7 D-51580 Reichshof-Wiehl / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1995/15] | Representative(s) | Missling, Arne Böck Tappe Kollegen Ludwigsplatz 9 35390 Giessen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/15] | Missling, Arne, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Bismarckstrasse 43 D-35390 Giessen / DE | Application number, filing date | 94105446.2 | 08.04.1994 | [1995/15] | Priority number, date | DE19934333811 | 04.10.1993 Original published format: DE 4333811 | [1995/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0647569 | Date: | 12.04.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0647569 | Date: | 10.06.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B65D83/00 | [1995/15] | CPC: |
B05C17/00579 (EP);
B65D83/0005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/15] | Extension states | SI | 16.04.1994 | Title | German: | Kolben für Kartuschen | [1995/15] | English: | Piston for cartridges | [1995/15] | French: | Piston pour cartouches | [1995/15] | Examination procedure | 05.10.1995 | Examination requested [1995/48] | 27.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.10.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.03.1999
ADMISSIBLE Raytec B.V. Albert Einsteinweg 10, Postbus 314 5150 AH Drunen / NL Opponent's representative Spierenburg, Pieter Spierenburg & Partner AG Patent- und Markenanwälte Mellingerstrasse 12 5443 Niederrohrdorf / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1999/17] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.03.1999
ADMISSIBLE Raytec B.V. Albert Einsteinweg 10, Postbus 314 5150 AH Drunen / NL Opponent's representative Spierenburg, Pieter Patentanwalt Dipl.-Phys. P. Spierenburg Im Grund 12 5405 Baden-Dättwil / CH | 16.03.1999 | No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 27.03.1999 | No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 12.04.1999 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 09.06.1999 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 20.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 27.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 23.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M03) | 14.09.2000 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 06.07.2001 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.08.2001 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 13.08.2001 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 17.06.2002 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2002/39] | Appeal following opposition | 10.10.2001 | Appeal received No. T1119/01 | 11.12.2001 | Statement of grounds filed | 17.06.2002 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 10.06.1998 | AT | 08.04.2002 | GB | 08.04.2002 | IE | 08.04.2002 | LU | 08.04.2002 | MC | 08.04.2002 | ES | 09.04.2002 | SE | 09.04.2002 | BE | 30.04.2002 | CH | 30.04.2002 | DK | 30.04.2002 | LI | 30.04.2002 | [2004/39] |
Former [2004/28] | GR | 10.06.1998 | |
AT | 08.04.2002 | ||
GB | 08.04.2002 | ||
IE | 08.04.2002 | ||
MC | 08.04.2002 | ||
ES | 09.04.2002 | ||
SE | 09.04.2002 | ||
BE | 30.04.2002 | ||
CH | 30.04.2002 | ||
DK | 30.04.2002 | ||
LI | 30.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/48] | GR | 10.06.1998 | |
AT | 08.04.2002 | ||
GB | 08.04.2002 | ||
IE | 08.04.2002 | ||
MC | 08.04.2002 | ||
SE | 09.04.2002 | ||
BE | 30.04.2002 | ||
CH | 30.04.2002 | ||
DK | 30.04.2002 | ||
LI | 30.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/45] | GR | 10.06.1998 | |
AT | 08.04.2002 | ||
GB | 08.04.2002 | ||
IE | 08.04.2002 | ||
MC | 08.04.2002 | ||
SE | 09.04.2002 | ||
CH | 30.04.2002 | ||
DK | 30.04.2002 | ||
LI | 30.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/31] | GR | 10.06.1998 | |
AT | 08.04.2002 | ||
GB | 08.04.2002 | ||
IE | 08.04.2002 | ||
MC | 08.04.2002 | ||
SE | 09.04.2002 | ||
CH | 30.04.2002 | ||
LI | 30.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/29] | GR | 10.06.1998 | |
GB | 08.04.2002 | ||
IE | 08.04.2002 | ||
MC | 08.04.2002 | ||
SE | 09.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/25] | GR | 10.06.1998 | |
GB | 08.04.2002 | ||
MC | 08.04.2002 | ||
SE | 09.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/17] | GR | 10.06.1998 | |
GB | 08.04.2002 | ||
SE | 09.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/03] | GR | 10.06.1998 | |
SE | 09.04.2002 | ||
Former [2001/23] | GR | 10.06.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]GB2071268 (FISCHBACH A KUNSTSTOFF KG) [X] 1-4,6,8,9 * page 3, line 74 - page 4, line 8; figures 4-6 * [A] 5,7; | [XA]EP0081145 (FISCHBACH A KUNSTSTOFF KG [DE]) [X] 1-4,6,8,9 * page 6, line 24 - page 8, line 7; figures 1-4 *[A] 5,7; | [XA]DE9211218U (PRESTELE) [X] 1-4,6,8,9 * page 5, line 12 - page 6, line 4; figures 1-3 * [A] 5,7 |