EP0634256 - Method of creating a concrete surface pattern finish [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.1998 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KINKI REGIONAL CONSTRUCTION BUREAU 1-5-44 Otemae, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540 / JP | For all designated states CHUO KASEI CO., LTD. 3-11 Minami-senba 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 542 / JP | For all designated states J.C. COMPOSITE CO., LTD. 3-4 Uchi-awajimachi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/03] | For all designated states KINKI REGIONAL CONSTRUCTION BUREAU 1-5-44 Otemae, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540 / JP | ||
For all designated states CHUO KASEI CO., LTD. 3-11 Minami-senba 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542 / JP | |||
For all designated states J.C. COMPOSITE CO., LTD. 3-4 Uchi-awajimachi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shimada, Tetsuhiro B-103. 3732-1 Korigaoka 10-chome Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573 / JP | 02 /
Imahori, Goro 12-5, Tsuda-nishimachi 2-chome Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-01 / JP | 03 /
Kojima, Eiichi 2-16-12 Gakuen Midorigaoka Nara-shi, Nara 631 / JP | 04 /
Iwata, Fujio 4-23 Korigaoka Jutaku, 14-2 Korigaoka 1-chome Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573 / JP | 05 /
Furuie, Shuichiro B-8-301, 3-16 Korigaoka Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573 / JP | [1995/03] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/03] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94105460.3 | 08.04.1994 | [1995/03] | Priority number, date | JP19930112311 | 14.04.1993 Original published format: JP 11231193 | JP19930229431 | 23.08.1993 Original published format: JP 22943193 | [1995/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0634256 | Date: | 18.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B28B7/36, B28B11/00, C04B41/45, B44C1/17, // C04B41/61 | [1995/03] | CPC: |
C04B41/009 (EP);
B28B11/001 (EP);
B28B7/36 (EP);
B44C1/1716 (EP);
C04B41/52 (EP);
C04B41/70 (EP);
C04B2111/542 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C04B41/009, C04B28/02 (EP);
C04B41/52, C04B41/4511, C04B41/4572, C04B41/48 (EP);
C04B41/52, C04B41/4596, C04B41/48 (EP);
C04B41/52, C04B41/4596, C04B41/5076, C04B41/522 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/03] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen einer Dekoration auf einer Betonoberfläche | [1995/03] | English: | Method of creating a concrete surface pattern finish | [1995/03] | French: | Méthode pour l'obtention d'une décoration sur une surface de béton | [1995/03] | Examination procedure | 13.07.1995 | Examination requested [1995/36] | 30.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/33] | 16.03.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1998 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JPS8051770 [ ] (SHOWA DENKO KENZAI K.K.); | JPS6477599 [ ] (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO. , LTD.); | JPS7759623 [ ] (TOPPAN PRINTING CO. , LTD.); | [XY]DE2064543 (VE WISSENSCHAFTLICH-TECHNISCHER BETRIEB KERAMIK) [X] 2,6,7,12,13 * the whole document * [Y] 4,5,10; | [YA]US4213926 (M. TOYODA) [Y] 4,5,10 * column W * [A] 1-3,8,13; | [YA]US4426422 (G. R. E. DANIELS) [Y] 4,5,10 * the whole document , in particular column 4 , line 21 - column 4 , line 24 * [A] 2,3,6,7,11; | [YA]US4496618 (V. S. PERNICANO) [Y] 4,5,10 * the whole document , in particular column 2 , line 43 - column 2 , line 55 ; figure 2 * [A] 2,3,6,7,11; | [YA]GB1158497 (ARNOLD DESIGNS LIMITED) [Y] 4,5 * the whole document * [A] 2,3; | JPS8071600 [ ] (TOPPAN PRINTING CO. , LTD.); | [A]US4937033 (A. OSHIO) [A] 1,7,8,13 * column W *; | [A]US2970076 (F. L. PORTH) [A] 2-8,12,13 * column W *; | [A]US3642551 (R. L. LACONICH) [A] 2-8,12,13 * column W *; | [A]GB991640 (JOHNSON , MATTHEY & CO. LIMITED) [A] 2-8,12,13 * the whole document * | [XY] - H. KAWAGUCHI, "DECORATIVE BOARDS USEFUL AS BUILDING MATERIALS", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19801117), vol. 93, no. 20, Database accession no. 191097q, page 300 [X] 1,13 * abstract * [Y] 4,5,10 | [XY] - H. GOTO, "PAINTING OF LIGHTWEIGHT FOAMED CONCRETE", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19891016), vol. 111, no. 16, Database accession no. 139540e, page 335 [X] 2,6,12,13 * abstract * [Y] 4,5,10 | [XY] - H. NAGAOSA, "INORGANIC DECORATIVE PLATE", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19780109), vol. 88, no. 2, Database accession no. 11068w, page 244 [X] 2,3,12,13 * abstract * [Y] 4,5,10 | [A] - "DECORATIVE BUILDING BOARDS", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19810126), vol. 94, no. 4, Database accession no. 19657g, page 257 [A] 1,3,9,13 * abstract * |