Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0627188
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
04.01.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] |
09.05.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] |
27.03.1998 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 13.05.1998 [1998/20] |
20.02.1998 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.1998 [1998/15] |
04.04.1997 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 21.05.1997 [1997/21] |
15.03.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
06.02.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
14.11.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
12.07.1996 |
First examination report |
|
10.07.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
15.03.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
12.09.1995 |
Change - applicant |
published on 02.11.1995 [1995/44] |
20.01.1995 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 08.03.1995 [1995/10] |
21.10.1994 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 07.12.1994 [1994/49] |