Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0627188 | Global Dossier | 21.05.1997 | B1 | EP0627188 | 07.12.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE4318113 | 01.06.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE153228T | 15.06.1997 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE4318113 | 01.06.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE4318113 | 01.06.1994 | C1 | Priority number | Date | DE4318113 | 01.06.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59402804D1 | 26.06.1997 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE4318113 | 01.06.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5485778 | 23.01.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | DE4318113 | 01.06.1993 |