EP0627188 - Brewing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.03.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Braun Aktiengesellschaft Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/44] | For all designated states Braun Aktiengesellschaft Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [1994/49] | For all designated states Braun Aktiengesellschaft D-60326 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ullmann, Roland Edith-Stein-Strasse 8 D-63075 Offenbach / DE | [1994/49] | Application number, filing date | 94105665.7 | 13.04.1994 | [1994/49] | Priority number, date | DE19934318113 | 01.06.1993 Original published format: DE 4318113 | [1994/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0627188 | Date: | 07.12.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0627188 | Date: | 21.05.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A47J31/44 | [1994/49] | CPC: |
A47J31/4471 (EP,US);
A47J31/446 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, LI, NL [1994/49] | Title | German: | Brühgetränkemaschine | [1994/49] | English: | Brewing apparatus | [1994/49] | French: | Appareil pour préparer des infusions | [1994/49] | Examination procedure | 11.01.1995 | Examination requested [1995/10] | 12.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.11.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 21.05.1997 | GB | 21.05.1997 | NL | 21.05.1997 | [2003/08] |
Former [2002/26] | ES | 21.05.1997 | |
GB | 21.05.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | GB | 21.05.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE8914876U (LICENTIA PATENTVERWALTUNGS-GMBH) [A] 1,2,6* page 2, paragraph L - page 3, paragraph 1; figure - *; | [A]GB2229354 (RUSSELL HOBBS TOWER LIMITED [GB]) [A] 1,6 * page 3, line 33 - page 8, line 33; figure - *; | [A]US4995311 (NAYA MASARU [JP], et al) [A] 1,6 * column 3, line 66 - column 5, line 42; figures 1-6 *; | [A]DE9112320U (ROWENTA-WERKE GMBH) [A] 1,2,6 * page 4; figure - * |