EP0621647 - Hydrogen storage alloy and electrode therefrom [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.02.1999 [1999/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/09] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | ||
Former [1994/43] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamamura, Yasuharu 3-305, Myokenzaka 3-chome Katano City 576 / JP | 02 /
Seri, Hajime 9-19, Takatsu-cho Izumiotsu City 595 / JP | 03 /
Tsuji, Yoichiro Shokeiryo, 4-2, Korigaoka 7-chome Hirakata City 573 / JP | 04 /
(nee Maekawa) Owada, Naoko 40-8, Kisabe 4-chome Katano City 576 / JP | 05 /
Iwaki, Tsutomu 26-193, Hashimoto-kurigadani Yawata City 614 / JP | [1994/43] | Representative(s) | advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft Tappe mbB Widenmayerstraße 4 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/43] | Dr. Elisabeth Jung Dr. Jürgen Schirdewahn Dipl.-Ing. Claus Gernhardt Postfach 40 14 68 D-80714 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94105990.9 | 18.04.1994 | [1994/43] | Priority number, date | JP19930092865 | 20.04.1993 Original published format: JP 9286593 | [1994/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0621647 | Date: | 26.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0621647 | Date: | 25.02.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/38 | [1994/43] | CPC: |
H01M4/383 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y10S420/90 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1994/43] | Title | German: | Wasserstoffspeicherlegierung und ihre Verwendung bei einer Elektrode | [1994/43] | English: | Hydrogen storage alloy and electrode therefrom | [1994/43] | French: | Alliage pour le stockage d'hydrogène et électrode utilisant cet alliage | [1994/43] | Examination procedure | 18.04.1994 | Examination requested [1994/43] | 13.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.08.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.11.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS60241652 ; | [PX]EP0552790 (HITACHI MAXELL [JP]) [PX] 1,6,7 * page 4, line 12 - line 14; example 5; claims 1,3; table 1 *; | [A]EP0450590 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,5 * page 3, line 39; claims 1,9 *; | [A]EP0506084 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,7 * claim 1; table 1 *; | [A]EP0293660 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,7 *TABLE 5, ALLOY NUMBER 126*; | [DA]JPS6460961 ; | [DA]JPH01102855 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860416), vol. 10, no. 99, Database accession no. (E - 396), & JP60241652 A 19851130 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO KK) [X] 1,4,6,7 * abstract * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890621), vol. 13, no. 270, Database accession no. (E - 776), & JP01060961 A 19890308 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO) [DA] * abstract * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890803), vol. 13, no. 344, Database accession no. (E - 797), & JP01102855 A 19890420 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO) [DA] * abstract * |