EP0636754 - Fastening element and driving tool for such a fastening element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.04.1998 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.06.1998 [1998/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EJOT Kunststofftechnik GmbH & Co. KG Adolf-Böhl-Strasse 7 D-57319 Bad Berleburg / DE | [1996/43] |
Former [1995/05] | For all designated states EJOT KUNSTSTOFFTECHNIK GmbH & Co. KG Adolf-Böhl-Strasse 7 D-57319 Bad Berleburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Riecke, Ernst-Hermann Ostpreussenstrasse 5 D-57319 Bad Berleburg-Berghausen / DE | [1995/05] | Representative(s) | Missling, Arne Böck Tappe Kollegen Ludwigsplatz 9 35390 Giessen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/05] | Missling, Arne, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Bismarckstrasse 43 D-35390 Giessen / DE | Application number, filing date | 94106028.7 | 19.04.1994 | [1995/05] | Priority number, date | DE19930011122U | 26.07.1993 Original published format: DE 9311122 U | [1995/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0636754 | Date: | 01.02.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0636754 | Date: | 18.06.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | E04F13/08, E04D3/36, B25D17/08 | [1995/05] | CPC: |
E04B1/7633 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1995/05] | Title | German: | Befestigungselement und Setzgerät für ein solches Befestigungselement | [1995/05] | English: | Fastening element and driving tool for such a fastening element | [1995/05] | French: | Elément de fixation et outil d'enfoncement pour un tel élément de fixation | [1995/05] | Examination procedure | 11.01.1995 | Examination requested [1995/10] | 06.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.11.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3409373 (HONSEL NIETEN & METALLWARENFAB [DE], et al) [A] 1,3,11 * page 6, line 6 - page 9, line 9; figures 1-7 *; | [DA]EP0189569 (EJOT ADOLF BOHL GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [DA] 1,11 * page 8, line 15 - page 15, line 26; figures 1-14 *; | [A]DE3538271 (NIEDERBERG CHEMIE [DE]) [A] 1,11 * column 4, line 64 - column 6, line 6; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0420799 (HILTI AG [LI]) [A] 1,11* column 3, line 4 - column 4, line 34; figures 1-4 *; | [A]DE9209623U (EJOT ADOLF BÖHL GMBH & CO KG) [A] 1,11 * page 6, line 17 - page 9, line 11; figures 1-8 * |