Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0621528
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
19.04.2002 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 05.06.2002 [2002/23] |
27.04.2001 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 13.06.2001 [2001/24] |
11.04.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
27.01.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
14.11.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
14.11.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
24.07.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
30.05.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
08.05.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
11.04.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
20.10.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
13.08.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
19.05.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
16.04.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
16.03.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
06.11.1998 |
First examination report |
|
30.10.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
06.04.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
04.04.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
02.04.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
26.04.1995 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 14.06.1995 [1995/24] |
09.09.1994 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 26.10.1994 [1994/43] |