EP0621515 - Image forming apparatus having a photosensitive member [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.03.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toshiba TEC Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1, Kanda Nishiki-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 101-8442 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/22] | For all designated states Toshiba Tec Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1, Kanda Nishiki-cho, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 101-8442 / JP | ||
Former [1996/01] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha TEC 570 Ohito, Ohito-cho, Tagata-gun Shizuoka / JP | ||
Former [1994/43] | For all designated states TOKYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 6-13, 2-chome, Nakameguro Meguro-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ohtaka, Yoshimitsu 488 Shimotogari, Nagaizumi-cho Sunto-gun, Shizuoka-ken / JP | [1994/43] | Representative(s) | Fuchs Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 46 60 65036 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Fuchs Patentanwälte Postfach 46 60 65036 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [1998/03] | Fuchs Mehler Weiss Patentanwälte Postfach 46 60 65036 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [1994/43] | Dr. Fuchs, Dr. Luderschmidt Dr. Mehler, Dipl.-Ing Weiss Patentanwälte Postfach 46 60 D-65036 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 94106164.0 | 21.04.1994 | [1994/43] | Priority number, date | JP19930094523 | 21.04.1993 Original published format: JP 9452393 | JP19940013553 | 07.02.1994 Original published format: JP 1355394 | [1994/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0621515 | Date: | 26.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0621515 | Date: | 11.03.1998 | [1998/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/00 | [1994/43] | CPC: |
G03G21/1853 (EP,US);
G03G15/04072 (EP,US);
G03G15/326 (EP,US);
G03G21/1638 (EP,US);
G03G15/0435 (EP,US);
G03G2221/163 (EP,US);
G03G2221/1636 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1994/43] | Title | German: | Bilderzeugungsgerät mit einem lichtempfindlichen Teil | [1994/43] | English: | Image forming apparatus having a photosensitive member | [1994/43] | French: | Appareil de formation d'images muni d'un élément photosensible | [1994/43] | Examination procedure | 28.08.1998 | Examination requested [1998/44] | 08.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/18] | 14.12.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0427471 (TOKYO ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,7-9 * column 9, line 20 - line 44; figure 6 *; | [X]US4673956 (KOBAYASHI HIROO [JP]) [X] 1,7-9 * column 3, line 34 - line 49; figure 1 *; | [X]JPS6488558 ; | [X]JPH01270066 ; | [A]JPH02259782 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890719), vol. 013, no. 319, Database accession no. (P - 901), & JP01088558 A 19890403 (KYOCERA CORP) [X] 1 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900123), vol. 014, no. 035, Database accession no. (P - 994), & JP01270066 A 19891027 (CANON INC) [X] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910114), vol. 015, no. 016, Database accession no. (P - 1152), & JP02259782 A 19901022 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * |