EP0622195 - Drop detection circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.06.1999 [1999/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304-1112 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/44] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stewart, Lowell 12439 Holland Avenue Poway, California 92064 / US | [1994/44] | Representative(s) | Harbach, Thomas Agilent Technologies Deutschland GmbH Patentabteilung Herrenbergerstrasse 130 71034 Böblingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/44] | Harbach, Thomas c/o Hewlett-Packard GmbH, Herrenberger Strasse 130 D-71034 Böblingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 94106214.3 | 21.04.1994 | [1994/44] | Priority number, date | US19930056011 | 30.04.1993 Original published format: US 56011 | [1994/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0622195 | Date: | 02.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0622195 | Date: | 04.12.1996 | [1996/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0622195 | Date: | 10.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/115, B41J2/125 | [1996/48] | CPC: |
B41J2/125 (EP,US);
B41J2/115 (EP,US);
B41J2/16579 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1994/44] | B41J2/115 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1994/44] | Title | German: | Tropfendetektorschaltung | [1994/44] | English: | Drop detection circuit | [1994/44] | French: | Circuit de détection de gouttes | [1994/44] | Examination procedure | 30.10.1996 | Examination requested [1996/52] | 20.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.12.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]SU1486793 ; | [A]US4255754 (CREAN PETER A, et al) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]US4328504 (WEBER HELMUT, et al) [A] 1-6 * column W *; | [A]US4410895 (HOUSTON ROBERT D [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]US4751517 (CREAN PETER A [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * column W *; | [PA]EP0568173 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [PA] 1-6 * column W *; | [A] - PETTIT, J.W., "DUAL-CHANNEL DETECTOR CIRCUIT", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, NEW YORK US, (198112), vol. 24, no. 7b, pages 3976 - 3977, XP002015136 [A] 1-6 * the whole document * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 90, no. 13, Database accession no. 90-097857, XP002015137 & SU1486793 A 19890615 (VOROBEV, S.A.) [A] 1-6 * abstract * |