EP0623435 - Process for producing concrete form made of thermoplastic resin [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 16.01.1998 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY LIMITED 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0041 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/38] | For all designated states SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY LIMITED 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541 / JP | ||
Former [1994/45] | For all designated states SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY, LIMITED 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsumoto, Masahito 2-1-133, Kuwatacho Ibaraki-shi / JP | 02 /
Kitayama, Takeo 9-1, Tamagawa-1-chome Takatsuki-shi / JP | 03 /
Matsubara, Shigeyoshi 7-3, Zuiko-1-chome, Higashiyodogawa-ku Osaka-shi / JP | [1994/45] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/45] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94106598.9 | 27.04.1994 | [1994/45] | Priority number, date | JP19930103892 | 30.04.1993 Original published format: JP 10389293 | [1994/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0623435 | Date: | 09.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B28B7/34, E04G9/05, B29C37/00, B29C45/56, B29C43/02 | [1994/45] | CPC: |
B28B7/346 (EP,US);
B28B7/348 (EP,US);
B29C37/005 (EP,US);
B29C45/561 (EP,US);
E04G9/05 (EP,US);
E04G2009/028 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/45] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Form für Beton aus thermoplastischem Kunststoff | [1994/45] | English: | Process for producing concrete form made of thermoplastic resin | [1994/45] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication d'un moule pour béton en résine thermoplastique | [1994/45] | Examination procedure | 14.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/19] | 10.04.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 30.09.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1998/10] | 10.10.1997 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1998/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1997 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0047387 (POLYGRAM GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]JPS62109618 ; | [A]EP0439625 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]US3891179 (BERMAN MORTON) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]JPH028459 ; | [A]GB1160714 (KREIER GEORGE JULIUS [US]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [T]WO9409227 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP], et al) [T] 1-7 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19871024), vol. 11, no. 327, Database accession no. (M - 635)<2774> , & JP62109618 A 19870520 (SONY CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900316), vol. 14, no. 140, Database accession no. (M - 950)<4083> , & JP02008459 A 19900111 (IDEMITSU N S G K.K.) [A] 1-3 * abstract * |