EP0646753 - Thermal insulated door window unit for an appliance with an inner temperature differing from the ambient one [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.08.1999 [1999/33] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
ES
FR
NL
Schott Glas Hattenbergstrasse 10 55122 Mainz / DE | For:GB
CARL-ZEISS-STIFTUNG trading as Schott Glas Hattenbergstrasse 10 55122 Mainz / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/31] | For:DE
ES
FR
NL
Schott Glas Hattenbergstrasse 10 55122 Mainz / DE | ||
For:GB
CARL-ZEISS-STIFTUNG trading as Schott Glas Hattenbergstrasse 10 55122 Mainz / DE | |||
Former [1998/19] | For:DE
ES
FR
NL
Schott Glas Hattenbergstrasse 10 55122 Mainz / DE | ||
For:GB
Carl-Zeiss-Stiftung trading as SCHOTT GLASWERKE Hattenbergstrasse 10 D-55122 Mainz / DE | |||
Former [1995/14] | For:DE
ES
FR
NL
Schott Glaswerke Hattenbergstrasse 10 D-55122 Mainz / DE | ||
For:GB
Carl-Zeiss-Stiftung trading as SCHOTT GLASWERKE Hattenbergstrasse 10 D-55122 Mainz / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Busch, Dietrich Sponheimer Ring 46 D-55469 Simmern / DE | 02 /
Leroux, Roland, Dr. Spielbergstrasse 49 a D-55271 Stad.-Elsheim / DE | [1995/14] | Application number, filing date | 94106719.1 | 29.04.1994 | [1995/14] | Priority number, date | DE19934333033 | 29.09.1993 Original published format: DE 4333033 | [1995/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0646753 | Date: | 05.04.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0646753 | Date: | 20.12.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0646753 | Date: | 26.08.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F24C15/04, F24C15/34 | [1995/14] | CPC: |
F24C15/04 (EP,US);
F24C15/34 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, NL [1995/14] | Title | German: | Temperaturdämmendes Sichtfenster oder -türe für ein Gerät mit von seiner Umgebungstemperatur abweichender Innentemperatur | [1995/14] | English: | Thermal insulated door window unit for an appliance with an inner temperature differing from the ambient one | [1995/14] | French: | Regard de porte à isolation thermique pour appareil à température différente de la température ambiante | [1995/14] | Examination procedure | 14.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/19] | 08.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.02.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2310084 (GLAVERBEL) [X] 1,2,4,14,15 * page 24, paragraph 2 - page 25, paragraph 2; figure 10; claims 1-14 *; | [X]DE2545531 (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [PX]DE4209622 (SCHOTT GLASWERKE [DE]) [PX] 1-3,6,14,15* page 5, line 60 - page 6, line 55; figure - * |