EP0623851 - Photographic film processing assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.01.1996 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.01.1996 [1996/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/45] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zander, Dennis Roland, c/o Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | [1994/45] | Representative(s) | Blickle, K. Werner KODAK AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Patentabteilung 70323 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/45] | Blickle, K. Werner, Dipl.-Ing. KODAK AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Patentabteilung D-70323 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 94106810.8 | 02.05.1994 | [1994/45] | Priority number, date | US19930057025 | 05.05.1993 Original published format: US 57025 | [1994/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0623851 | Date: | 09.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G03D13/00 | [1994/45] | CPC: |
G03D13/003 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/45] | Title | German: | Photographisches Filmbehandlungsgerät | [1994/45] | English: | Photographic film processing assembly | [1994/45] | French: | Système de traitement de films photographiques | [1994/45] | File destroyed: | 14.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 10.05.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/05] | 01.09.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1996/05] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DYA]EP0469594 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [DY] 8 * column 5, line 18 - column 6, line 12; figures 3,4A * [DA] 1,5,7; | [DYA]DE4038661 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [DY] 8 * abstract * [DA] 1,5,7; | [DA]US5173730 (DIETERICH DAVID A [US], et al) [DA] 1 * figure 2; claim 1 *; | [DA]EP0349448 (KIS PHOTO IND [FR], et al) [DA] 1,8 * abstract *; | [DA]DE3305481 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [DA] 1,8 * abstract * |