EP0639593 - Process for preparing aqueous modified epoxy resin dispersions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/08] | Aqueous modified epoxy resin dispersions | ||
[2000/26] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.08.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Solutia Germany GmbH & Co. KG Boelckestrasse 26 55252 Mainz-Kastel / DE | [2001/35] |
Former [1995/08] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pfeil, Armin, Dr. Ahornring 49 D-86916 Kaufering / DE | 02 /
Hönel, Michael, Dr. Bertha-von-Suttner-Strasse 14 D-65189 Wiesbaden / DE | 03 /
Oberressl, Paul Bertramstrasse 4 D-65185 Wiesbaden / DE | 04 /
Dreischhoff, Dieter Pestalozzistrasse 32 D-65203 Wiesbaden / DE | 05 /
Petri, Stefan Flachsbühlstrasse 19 D-65232 Taunusstein / DE | [2001/42] |
Former [1995/08] | 01 /
Pfeil, Armin, Dr. Hessenring 26 D-65205 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
02 /
Hönel, Michael, Dr. Bertha-von-Suttner-Strasse 14 D-65189 Wiesbaden / DE | |||
03 /
Oberressl, Paul Bertramstrasse 4 D-65185 Wiesbaden / DE | |||
04 /
Dreischhoff, Dieter Pestalozzistrasse 32 D-65203 Wiesbaden / DE | |||
05 /
Petri, Stefan Flachsbühlstrasse 19 D-65232 Taunusstein / DE | Application number, filing date | 94106816.5 | 02.05.1994 | [1995/08] | Priority number, date | DE19934327493 | 16.08.1993 Original published format: DE 4327493 | [1995/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0639593 | Date: | 22.02.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0639593 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C08F283/10, C08L63/00, C08L71/02, C08G59/04, C08G59/06, C08J3/03 | [1995/08] | CPC: |
C08G59/066 (EP,US);
C08F283/10 (EP,US);
C08L71/02 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L71/02, C08L63/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE [2001/42] |
Former [1995/08] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung wässriger, modifizierter Epoxidharz-Dispersionen | [2000/26] | English: | Process for preparing aqueous modified epoxy resin dispersions | [2000/26] | French: | Procédé pour préparer des dispersions aqueuses d'époxy modifié | [2000/26] |
Former [1995/08] | Wässrige, modifizierte Epoxidharz-Dispersionen | ||
Former [1995/08] | Aqueous modified epoxy resin dispersions | ||
Former [1995/08] | Dispersion aqueuses d'époxy modifié | Examination procedure | 22.08.1995 | Examination requested [1995/42] | 13.05.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.04.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IE | 17.10.2001 | IT | 17.10.2001 | DK | 17.01.2002 | ES | 30.04.2002 | AT | 02.05.2002 | BE | 31.05.2002 | CH | 31.05.2002 | LI | 31.05.2002 | [2008/05] |
Former [2004/04] | IE | 17.10.2001 | |
DK | 17.01.2002 | ||
ES | 30.04.2002 | ||
AT | 02.05.2002 | ||
BE | 31.05.2002 | ||
CH | 31.05.2002 | ||
LI | 31.05.2002 | ||
Former [2003/48] | IE | 17.10.2001 | |
DK | 17.01.2002 | ||
AT | 02.05.2002 | ||
BE | 31.05.2002 | ||
CH | 31.05.2002 | ||
LI | 31.05.2002 | ||
Former [2003/47] | IE | 17.10.2001 | |
DK | 17.01.2002 | ||
AT | 02.05.2002 | ||
CH | 31.05.2002 | ||
LI | 31.05.2002 | ||
Former [2003/45] | IE | 17.10.2001 | |
DK | 17.01.2002 | ||
CH | 31.05.2002 | ||
LI | 31.05.2002 | ||
Former [2003/31] | IE | 17.10.2001 | |
CH | 31.05.2002 | ||
LI | 31.05.2002 | ||
Former [2002/48] | IE | 17.10.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB899413 (UNION CARBIDE CORP) [Y] 1-10 * example 1; claim 1 * * page 2, column 2, line 105 - line 115 *; | [A]US4522962 (ABBEY KIRK J [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * claim 1 ** column 3, line 45 - line 53 *; | [A]US4539378 (CUSCURIDA MICHAEL [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * example 1 *; | [Y]EP0330155 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [Y] 1-10 * page 8, line 53 - line 56 * * example 8 *; | [PX]EP0577958 (GLIDDEN CO [US]) [PX] 1-10 *The whole document* |