EP0631117 - Weighing apparatus for a supermarket checkout counter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 21.08.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.1998 | Opposition rejected | published on 07.10.1998 [1998/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bizerba GmbH & Co. KG Wilhelm-Kraut-Strasse 65 72336 Balingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/52] | For all designated states BIZERBA GmbH & Co. KG Wilhelm-Kraut-Strasse 65 D-72336 Balingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kraft, Horst Zimmereckstrasse 4 D-72336 Balingen / DE | 02 /
Purr, Horst Tannenweg 3 D-78144 Tennenbronn / DE | 03 /
Engelhardt, Edgar Talblick 40 D-72336 Balingen / DE | [1994/52] | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/52] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Uhlandstrasse 14 c D-70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 94106938.7 | 04.05.1994 | [1994/52] | Priority number, date | DE19934319299 | 10.06.1993 Original published format: DE 4319299 | [1994/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0631117 | Date: | 28.12.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0631117 | Date: | 04.10.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G01G19/414, G07G1/00 | [1994/52] | CPC: |
G01G19/4144 (EP,US);
G07G1/0045 (EP,US);
G07G1/0054 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1994/52] | Title | German: | Wägevorrichtung für den Kassenplatz eines Ladengeschäfts | [1994/52] | English: | Weighing apparatus for a supermarket checkout counter | [1994/52] | French: | Dispositif de pesage pour la caisse des comptoirs des supermarchés | [1994/52] | Examination procedure | 14.12.1994 | Examination requested [1995/06] | 16.03.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.04.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
26.06.1996
ADMISSIBLE STS GmbH Annastrasse 5 64342 Seeheim-Jgh. / DE | [1996/34] | 12.08.1996 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 24.02.1997 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 27.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M03) | 09.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 28.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M03) | 03.12.1997 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 08.05.1998 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 18.05.1998 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1998/41] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8605270 (NCR CO [US]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [Y]WO8804770 (NCR CO [US]) [Y] 5,6 * page 6, line 18 - line 30; figure 1 *; | [X]US4971176 (NOJIRI HOWARD H [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4 * column A * * column 2, line 8 - line 26 * * column 4, line 34 - line 66; figure 1 *; | [XAY]US4971177 (NOJIRI HOWARD H [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4 * column A * * column 5, line 59 - column 6, line 18 * * column 9, line 8 - line 21 * * column 10, line 46 - line 62; figures 9,10 * [A] 9 [Y] 5,6; | [A]US5139100 (BRAUNEIS JAMES E [US]) [A] 1 * column A * * column 2, line 22 - line 45 *; | [A]US5143164 (NAHAR RATHINDRA [US]) [A] 3 * column 3, line 41 - line 45 * |