EP0624959 - FM receiver with an oversampling circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.06.2000 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C.S.E.M. CENTRE SUISSE D'ELECTRONIQUE ET DE MICROTECHNIQUE SA Rue Jaquet-Droz 1 2007 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1999/31] | For all designated states C.S.E.M. CENTRE SUISSE D'ELECTRONIQUE ET DE MICROTECHNIQUE SA Rue Jaquet-Droz 1 2007 Neuchâtel / CH | ||
Former [1994/46] | For all designated states CSEM, Centre Suisse d'Electronique et de Microtechnique S.A. Recherche et Développement, Rue de la Maladière 71 CH-2007 Neuchâtel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pardoen, Matthijs D. Rue de la Gare 9 CH-2074 Marin / CH | [1994/46] | Representative(s) | de Montmollin, Henri, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Rue des Sors 7 2074 Marin / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1994/46] | de Montmollin, Henri, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Rue des Sors 7 CH-2074 Marin / CH | Application number, filing date | 94106952.8 | 04.05.1994 | [1994/46] | Priority number, date | FR19930005813 | 12.05.1993 Original published format: FR 9305813 | [1994/46] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0624959 | Date: | 17.11.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0624959 | Date: | 11.08.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/28, H04B1/30, H03D3/00 | [1994/46] | CPC: |
H03D3/007 (EP,US);
H04B1/28 (EP,US);
H04B1/30 (EP,US);
H03D2200/006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1994/46] | Title | German: | FM-Empfänger mit einer Schaltung zur Überabtastung | [1998/44] | English: | FM receiver with an oversampling circuit | [1994/46] | French: | Récepteur radio FM comprenant un circuit de suréchantillonnage | [1994/46] |
Former [1994/46] | FM-Empfänger mit eine Schaltung zur Überabtastung | Examination procedure | 21.04.1995 | Examination requested [1995/24] | 12.10.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.02.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.08.1999 | ES | 11.08.1999 | GR | 11.08.1999 | NL | 11.08.1999 | SE | 11.08.1999 | DK | 11.11.1999 | PT | 11.11.1999 | LU | 04.05.2000 | [2004/39] |
Former [2004/07] | AT | 11.08.1999 | |
ES | 11.08.1999 | ||
GR | 11.08.1999 | ||
NL | 11.08.1999 | ||
SE | 11.08.1999 | ||
DK | 11.11.1999 | ||
PT | 11.11.1999 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 11.08.1999 | |
ES | 11.08.1999 | ||
NL | 11.08.1999 | ||
SE | 11.08.1999 | ||
DK | 11.11.1999 | ||
PT | 11.11.1999 | ||
Former [2003/08] | AT | 11.08.1999 | |
ES | 11.08.1999 | ||
NL | 11.08.1999 | ||
SE | 11.08.1999 | ||
PT | 11.11.1999 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 11.08.1999 | |
ES | 11.08.1999 | ||
SE | 11.08.1999 | ||
PT | 11.11.1999 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 11.08.1999 | |
SE | 11.08.1999 | ||
PT | 11.11.1999 | ||
Former [2001/12] | AT | 11.08.1999 | |
IE | 11.08.1999 | ||
PT | 11.11.1999 | ||
Former [2000/26] | AT | 11.08.1999 | |
PT | 11.11.1999 | ||
Former [2000/24] | AT | 11.08.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9302507 (PHASE TRACK LTD [GB]) [A] 1-4,7* abstract *; | [A] - HICKMAN, "Direct-conversion FM design", ELECTRONICS & WIRELESS WORLD, SUTTON,GB, (199011), vol. 96, no. 11, pages 962 - 967, XP000171859 [A] 1-4,6 * page 962, column 2, line 5 - page 967, column 2, line 6; figures 1,9 * | [A] - DOOREMOLEN ET AL, "A complete f.m. radio on a chip", ELECTRONIC COMPONENTS & APPLICATIONS, EINDHOVEN,NL, (198306), vol. 5, no. 3, pages 159 - 170, XP000817014 [A] 1 * page 161, column 1, line 20 - page 162, column 2, line 12; figures 1,5 * |