EP0624525 - Self-closing closure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.11.1998 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.12.1998 [1998/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Linneweber, Wolfgang An den Gehren 32 D-33605 Bielefeld / DE | [1994/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1994/46] | Representative(s) | Schirmer, Siegfried, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltssozietät Detmolderstrasse 235 33605 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/46] | Schirmer, Siegfried, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwalt Osningstrasse 10 D-33605 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 94107026.0 | 05.05.1994 | [1994/46] | Priority number, date | DE19934315697 | 11.05.1993 Original published format: DE 4315697 | DE19944406162 | 25.02.1994 Original published format: DE 4406162 | [1994/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0624525 | Date: | 17.11.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0624525 | Date: | 08.02.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0624525 | Date: | 29.12.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B65D35/50, B65D47/20 | [1995/04] | CPC: |
B65D47/2031 (EP);
B65D47/2018 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1994/46] | B65D47/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1994/46] | Title | German: | Selbstschliessender Verschluss | [1994/46] | English: | Self-closing closure | [1994/46] | French: | Fermeture automatique | [1994/46] | Examination procedure | 07.08.1995 | Examination requested [1995/40] | 01.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.12.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.06.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 26.09.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US1825553 (SMITH ARTHUR E) [X] 19,22,23; | [A]DE1586926 (SCHWARTZMAN GILBERT) [A] 1,19; | [A]US3754690 (MARCHANT P) [A] 1,19; | [DA]DE2515095 (NILSON BILLY)[DA] 1,19 |