EP0627780 - Non-aqueous liquid electrolyte secondary cell [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.1997 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.08.1997 [1997/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/49] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sugeno, Naoyuki, c/o Sony Energytec Inc. 1-1, Aza-Shimosugishita, Takakura, Hiwada-cho Koriyama, Fukushima-ken / JP | [1994/49] | Representative(s) | Müller, Frithjof E. Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/12] | Müller, Frithjof E., Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte MÜLLER & HOFFMANN, Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/49] | TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Mauerkircherstrasse 45 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94107163.1 | 06.05.1994 | [1994/49] | Priority number, date | JP19930123709 | 26.05.1993 Original published format: JP 12370993 | [1994/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0627780 | Date: | 07.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0627780 | Date: | 04.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/40 | [1994/49] | CPC: |
H01M10/0569 (EP,US);
H01M6/188 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/49] | Title | German: | Sekundärelement mit nichtwässrigem flüssigem Elektrolyten | [1994/49] | English: | Non-aqueous liquid electrolyte secondary cell | [1994/49] | French: | Pile secondaire à électrolyte liquide non-aqueux | [1994/49] | Examination procedure | 05.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/27] | 18.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.02.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0482287 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * claims 1-3 *; | [A]JPS5962518 ; | [A]EP0103738 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1 * page 1, line 1 - page 3, line 11; claim 1 * | [A] - A.N.DEY, "SAFETY STUDIES ON LI/SO2 CELLS", JOURNAL OF THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY, MANCHESTER, NEW HAMPSHIRE US, (19800901), vol. 127, no. 9, pages 1877 - 1881 [A] 1 * page 1878, column 1, paragraph 2 - column 2, paragraph 1; table 1 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840726), vol. 8, no. 162, Database accession no. (C - 235), & JP59062518 A 00000000 (SHINSEI YAKUHIN KOGYO KK) [A] 1 * abstract * |