EP0643180 - Profile for fixing a tensioned sheet and for hanging objects [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.06.2001 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.08.2001 [2001/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kluth, Marlene Sudermannstrasse 26 D-40721 Hilden / DE | [1995/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kluth, Manfred Sudermannstrasse 26 D-40721 Hilden / DE | [1995/11] | Representative(s) | Ackmann, Günther, et al Ackmann Menges Patentanwälte Postfach 14 04 31 80454 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/36] | Ackmann, Günther, et al Ackmann, Menges & Demski, Patentanwälte Postfach 10 01 01 47001 Duisburg / DE | ||
Former [1995/11] | Manderla, Thomas, Dr., et al Rechtsanwalt, Bankstrasse 1 D-40476 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 94107251.4 | 10.05.1994 | [1995/11] | Priority number, date | DE19934315499 | 10.05.1993 Original published format: DE 4315499 | [1995/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0643180 | Date: | 15.03.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0643180 | Date: | 19.07.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0643180 | Date: | 16.08.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.1995 | Classification | IPC: | E04B9/30, E04B9/00, E04B9/06, A47G1/16, B44C7/02 | [1995/26] | CPC: |
H01R25/14 (EP);
A47G1/1686 (EP);
E04B9/006 (EP);
E04B9/303 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1995/11] | E04B9/30, E04B9/00, E04B9/06, A47G1/16 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, FR, LI, LU, NL [1995/11] | Title | German: | Profilleiste zur Befestigung von Spannbahnen und zum Hängen von Objekten | [1995/11] | English: | Profile for fixing a tensioned sheet and for hanging objects | [1995/11] | French: | Profil pour la fixation d'une feuille tendue et pour la suspension d'objets | [1995/11] | Examination procedure | 14.12.1995 | Examination requested [1996/06] | 17.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.02.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0338925 (SCHERRER FERNAND) [X] 1,4-11 * column 2, line 40 - column 7, line 16; figure - *; | [A]DE4214005 (BANKAMP LEUCHTEN GMBH) [A] 2,3 * column 1, line 60 - column 3, line 7; figure - *; | [A]GB1150225 (H.T. CEILINGS LIMITED) [A] 1 * page 2, line 107 - page 3, line 77; figures 1-5 *; | [A]DE1784278 (REININGHAUS & CO); | [A]US3685235 (LANG MARSHALL IRA); | [A]CH481504 (WOERTZ); | [DA]DE2619931 (NORMALU SA) |