EP0626521 - Manifold valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.06.1998 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.07.1998 [1998/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMC Kabushiki Kaisha 16-4, Shimbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8659 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/48] | For all designated states SMC KABUSHIKI KAISHA 16-4, Shinbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fukano, Yoshihiro, c/o SMC K.K. Tsukuba Gijutsu Ctr, 2-2, Kinunodai 4-chome Yawara-mura, Tsukuba-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP | 02 /
Doi, Yoshitada, c/o SMC K.K. Tsukuba Gijutsu Ctr, 2-2, Kinunodai 4-chome Yawara-mura, Tsukuba-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP | 03 /
Mori, Toshiyuki, c/o SMC K.K. Tsukuba Gijutsu Ctr, 2-2, Kinunodai 4-chome Yawara-mura, Tsukuba-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP | [1994/48] | Representative(s) | Keil & Schaafhausen Patentanwälte PartGmbB Bockenheimer Landstraße 25 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/48] | KEIL & SCHAAFHAUSEN Patentanwälte Eysseneckstrasse 31 D-60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 94107253.0 | 10.05.1994 | [1994/48] | Priority number, date | JP19930133863 | 12.05.1993 Original published format: JP 13386393 | [1994/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0626521 | Date: | 30.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0626521 | Date: | 30.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | F15B13/08 | [1994/48] | CPC: |
F15B13/0839 (EP,US);
F15B13/0817 (EP,US);
F15B13/0857 (EP,US);
F15B13/0896 (EP,US);
Y10T137/86614 (EP,US);
Y10T137/87209 (EP,US);
Y10T137/87885 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/48] | Title | German: | Verteilerventil | [1994/48] | English: | Manifold valve | [1994/48] | French: | Soupape distributrice | [1994/48] | Examination procedure | 28.05.1994 | Examination requested [1994/48] | 02.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.01.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2531151 (BENNES MARREL [FR]); | [A]US4469128 (PETRIMAUX ERIC [FR], et al); | [A]DE4037353 (MANNESMANN AG) |