EP0624445 - Shredder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.01.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.02.1996 [1996/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bauer, Manfred Maierfeld 1 D-91781 Weissenburg / DE | [1994/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1994/46] | Representative(s) | Sasse, Volker Parreutstrasse 27 85049 Ingolstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/46] | Sasse, Volker, Dipl.-Ing. Parreutstrasse 27 D-85049 Ingolstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 94107392.6 | 11.05.1994 | [1994/46] | Priority number, date | DE19930007222U | 12.05.1993 Original published format: DE 9307222 U | [1994/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0624445 | Date: | 17.11.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B29B17/00, B02C18/44, B02C23/12, B29B13/10, // B29K25:00, B29K105:04, B29K105:26 | [1994/46] | CPC: |
B02C18/2216 (EP);
B02C13/284 (EP);
B29B17/02 (EP);
B29K2025/00 (EP);
Y02W30/62 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, DK, FR, IT, LI, NL [1994/46] | Title | German: | Schredder | [1994/46] | English: | Shredder | [1994/46] | French: | Broyeur | [1994/46] | File destroyed: | 13.09.2003 | Examination procedure | 18.05.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/09] | 19.09.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1996/09] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2124512 (NAT RES DEV) [X] 1,3,4 * the whole document *; | [A]DE9110978U (VIKING-UMWELTTECHNIK GMBH) [A] 1,3,12 * the whole document *; | [A]DE1779171 (MOESER STAHLBAU KG) [A] 1,3 * the whole document *; | [A]JPS56150514 | [X] - ING. (GRAD) HELLMUT TENNER, "VOM THERMOPLASTISCHEN ABFALL ZUM SEKUNDÄRROHSTOFF", PLASTVERARBEITER, SPEYER/RHEIN DE, (197504), vol. 26, no. 4, pages 185 - 190 [X] 1-4,6 * page 185, column L, line 11 - line 12 * * page 185, column R, line 19 - page 186, column R, line 24 * * ganz besonders Abbildung 2 * | [A] - HANS SAMANS, "KUNSTSTOFFABFALL IM KREISLAUF PROBLEMLÖSUNGEN", KUNSTSTOFFBERATER, ISERNHAGEN DE, (197610), vol. 21, no. 10, pages 520 - 526 [A] 1,3,6-8 * page 520, column L, line 4O * * page 524, column L, line 1 - page 526, column M, line 8 * * figure 1 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820227), vol. 6, no. 33, Database accession no. (M - 114)<911> , & JP56150514 A 19811121 (MEINOU KIKAI SEISAKUSHO K.K.) [A] 1,5 * abstract * | [A] - (LEITARTIKEL), "VERWERTUNGSMÖGLICHKEIT FÜR GEBRAUCHTE EPS-VERPACKUNGEN", PLASTVERARBEITER, SPEYER/RHEIN DE, (199106), vol. 42, no. 6, pages 124 - 125 [A] 1 * page 124, column R, line 10 - page 125, column L, line 13 * |